This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 22:22:50 (UTC).

DANIEL MERCADO VS. ST LUKES HOSPITAL et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2011 DANIEL MERCADO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ST LUKES HOSPITAL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6873

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCADO, DANIEL

Defendants

ST LUKE'S HOSPITAL

SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER AND DBA ST. LUKE'S HEALTH CARE CENTER (SUED HEREIN AS ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL)

STANFORD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND CLINICS

STANFORD HOSPITAL AND CLINICS (ERRONEOUSLY SUED SERVED HEREIN AS STANFORD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND CLINICS)

RASTANI MD, KASRA

NORTON MD, JEFFREY

CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL HOSPITAL

STANFORD UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER

FIRST DOE THROUGH ONE HUNDRETH DOE AND EACH OF THEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LERCH, ALLAN HARRIS

Attorney at ALLAN LERCH & ASSOCIATES

456 Montgomery Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

BENNETT, LAWRENCE ARTHUR

Attorney at DAVIDOVITZ & BENNETT LLP

1 Embarcadero Ctr, Ste 750

San Francisco, CA 94111-3614

SHEUERMAN, DAVID

Attorney at SHEUERMAN, MARTINI & TABARI

1033 Willow Street

San Jose, CA 95125

PRYOR, VIRGIL FRANCIS

Attorney at OIUM REYEN & PRYOR

220 Montgomery Street, Suite 910

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

MALPRACTICE - MEDICAL/DENTAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCADO, DANIEL AS TO DEFENDANT ST LUKE'S HOSPITAL CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL HOSPITAL STANFORD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND CLINICS NORTON MD, JEFFREY RASTANI MD, KASRA FIRST DOE THROUGH ONE HUNDRETH DOE AND EACH OF THEM STANFORD UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-25-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-21-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-10-2012 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER AND DBA ST. LUKE'S HEALTH CARE CENTER (SUED HEREIN AS ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL) (Fee:410.00)

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT NORTON MD, JEFFREY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTON MD, JEFFREY

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT STANFORD HOSPITAL AND CLINICS (ERRONEOUSLY SUED SERVED HEREIN AS STANFORD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND CLINICS) (Fee:410.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RASTANI MD, KASRA (Fee:410.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCADO, DANIEL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER AND DBA ST. LUKE'S HEALTH CARE CENTER (SUED HEREIN AS ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT RASTANI MD, KASRA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT STANFORD HOSPITAL AND CLINICS (ERRONEOUSLY SUED SERVED HEREIN AS STANFORD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND CLINICS) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-25-2012 CONTINUED TO JUN-29-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR ANSWER OR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT(S) STANFORD UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT STANFORD HOSPITAL AND CLINICS (ERRONEOUSLY SUED SERVED HEREIN AS STANFORD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND CLINICS) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER AND DBA ST. LUKE'S HEALTH CARE CENTER (SUED HEREIN AS ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCADO, DANIEL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT STANFORD UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT RASTANI MD, KASRA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAR-11-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-29-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-09-2013 VACATED. DISMISSAL FILED ON 12/19/12. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • DISCOVERY, 302, NO APPEARANCE, THE TENTATIVE RULING IS ADOPTED. DEFENDANT KASRA RASTANI'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER THAT HIS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS RE GENUINENESS OF DOCUMENTS BE DEEMED ADMITTED IS OFF CALENDAR. THIS CASE WAS DISMISSED ON DECEMBER 19, 2012. PRO TEM JUDGE: ERNST HALPERIN, CLERK: JACQUELINE ALAMEDA, NOT REPORTED. =302/JPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-03-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT RASTANI MD, KASRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT RASTANI MD, KASRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER THAT HIS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND REQUEST FRO ADMISSIONS RE GENUINESS OF DOCUMENTS BE DEEMED ADMITTED FILED BY DEFENDANT RASTANI MD, KASRA HEARING SET FOR JAN-03-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER AND DBA ST. LUKE'S HEALTH CARE CENTER (SUED HEREIN AS ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL) (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER AND DBA ST. LUKE'S HEALTH CARE CENTER (SUED HEREIN AS ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER AS TRIAL JUDGE FILED BY DEFENDANT STANFORD HOSPITAL AND CLINICS (ERRONEOUSLY SUED SERVED HEREIN AS STANFORD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND CLINICS)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT RASTANI MD, KASRA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER AND DBA ST. LUKE'S HEALTH CARE CENTER (SUED HEREIN AS ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCADO, DANIEL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RASTANI MD, KASRA (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT STANFORD HOSPITAL AND CLINICS (ERRONEOUSLY SUED SERVED HEREIN AS STANFORD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND CLINICS) (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTON MD, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT NORTON MD, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER AND DBA ST. LUKE'S HEALTH CARE CENTER (SUED HEREIN AS ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL) (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MALPRACTICE - MEDICAL/DENTAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCADO, DANIEL AS TO DEFENDANT ST LUKE'S HOSPITAL CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL HOSPITAL STANFORD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND CLINICS NORTON MD, JEFFREY RASTANI MD, KASRA FIRST DOE THROUGH ONE HUNDRETH DOE AND EACH OF THEM STANFORD UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-25-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-21-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-10-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6873
Case Title:DANIEL MERCADO VS. ST LUKES HOSPITAL et al
Court Date:JAN-03-2013 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order That His Request For Admissions And Request Fro Admissions Re Genuiness Of Documents Be Deemed Admitted
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, January 3, 2013, at 9:00 am, line 4, DEFENDANT KASRA RASTANI'S Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order That His Request For Admissions And Request For Admissions Re Genuiness Of Documents Be Deemed AdmittedOff calendar. This case was dismissed on December 19, 2012. =302/JPT


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST.LUKE'S HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Stanford University Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTER BAY HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where STANFORD HEALTH CARE A NONPROFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant