This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/09/2017 at 07:01:11 (UTC).

DANIEL FRANKLIN VS. MASTEK INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2017 DANIEL FRANKLIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MASTEK INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9986

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANKLIN, DANIEL

Defendants

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY

MASTEK INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOOD, CHRISTOPHER W

Attorney at DREYER, BABICH, BUCCOLA & CALLAHAM, LLP

20 Bicentenial Circle

Sacramento, CA 95826

Defendant Attorney

LEE, KENNETH H

Attorney at PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY LAW DEPARTMENT

77 Beale Street, B30A, P.O. Box 7442

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-06-2017 CONTINUED TO FEB-07-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61358407) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61343225) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANKLIN, DANIEL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61176750) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Proof of Service - PGE

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021147), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANKLIN, DANIEL SERVED AUG-15-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANKLIN, DANIEL AS TO DEFENDANT MASTEK INC. PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-06-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-05-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-13-2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2017
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R3417B14J003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : C0517B09J002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R9217929F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W0817707F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-06-2017 CONTINUED TO FEB-07-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 61358407) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61358407) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 61343225) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF FRANKLIN, DANIEL (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61343225) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANKLIN, DANIEL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61176750) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021147), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANKLIN, DANIEL SERVED AUG-15-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANKLIN, DANIEL AS TO DEFENDANT MASTEK INC. PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-06-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-05-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-13-2017 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mastek Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOOD CHRISTOPHER W.