This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/15/2016 at 15:26:43 (UTC).

DANIEL DEMETRIS VS. COURTNEY SANCHEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2015 DANIEL DEMETRIS filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against COURTNEY SANCHEZ. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4778

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMETRIS, DANIEL

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

SANCHEZ, COURTNEY

SEA STAR BAR

DOES 1-100

MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR")

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANTOR, ANDREW

Attorney at ANDREW S. CANTOR

4132 3Rd St., #7

San Francisco, CA 94124

Defendant Attorney

BURKE, MICHAEL S

Attorney at VOGL MEREDITH BURKE LLP

456 Montgomery Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC d/b/a THE SEA STARS NOTICE OF HEARING ON D

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15118036) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR") HEARING SET FOR NOV-18-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:450.00)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFT. MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A/ THE SEA STAR (TRANSACTION ID # 15119166)

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57271705) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEMETRIS, DANIEL

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC d/b/a THE SEA STA

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STARS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR HEARING WITHIN 35 DAYS OF FILING PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1320(D) (TRANSACTION ID # 15160108) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR")

Notice of Entry of judgment or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100000613) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR")

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100002442) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR")

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DEMETRIS, DANIEL TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR") SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Notice of entry of judgment or order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100003847)

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-10-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL/JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF DEMETRIS, DANIEL AS TO DEFENDANT SANCHEZ, COURTNEY SEA STAR BAR

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC d/b/a THE SEA STA

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STARS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING DEMURRER FOR HEARING WITHIN 35 DAYS OF FILING PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1320(D) (TRANSACTION ID # 15118109) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR")

DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC d/b/a THE SEA STARS EX PARTE APPLICATION F

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR HEARING WITHIN 35 DAYS OF FILING PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1320(D) (TRANSACTION ID # 15160108) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR") (Fee:60.00)

DECLARATION OF DIANE E. PRITCHARD RE DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC d/b/a

DECLARATION OF DIANE E. PRITCHARD RE DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STARS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR HEARING WITHIN 35 DAYS OF FILING PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1320(D) (TRANSACTION ID # 15160108) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR")

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR HEARING WITHIN 35 DAYS OF FILING PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1320(D); POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15160108) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR")

ORDER

ORDER ON DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR HEARING WITHIN 35 DAYS OF FILING PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.13.20(D)

Defendant majestic hall LLC d/b/a the sea stars notice of motion to st

MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100000650) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR") HEARING SET FOR JUL-14-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-29-2015 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) COURTNEY SANCHEZ AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE AUG-19-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Dismissal of Courtney Sanchez

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57919137) AS TO DEFENDANT SANCHEZ, COURTNEY

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-10-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL/JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57929769) AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-29-2015 CONTINUED TO NOV-10-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO DISMISS DOES 1-100 AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE SEP-29-2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57919137) AS TO DEFENDANT SANCHEZ, COURTNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100003847)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DEMETRIS, DANIEL TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR") SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-29-2015 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) COURTNEY SANCHEZ AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE AUG-19-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100002442) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC'S DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. ABSOLUTE PRIVILEGE STATUTE BARS CIVIL LIABILITY FOR A TORT CLAIM BASED UPON A PRIVILEGED COMMUNICATION, WITH THE EXCEPTION OF MALICIOUS PROSECUTION, WHOSE REQUIREMENTS INCLUDE MALICE, LACK OF PROBABLE CAUSE, AND TERMINATION IN THE PLAINTIFF'S FAVOR. [SEE CAL.CIV.CODE 47(B); HAGBERG V. CALIFORNIA FED. BANK FSB (2004) 32 CAL. 4TH 39, 81.] HERE, PLAINTIFF'S CAUSES OF ACTION ARE BASED ON DEFENDANT'S STATEMENTS TO THE POLICE, WHICH ARE PRIVILEGED AND CANNOT BE THE BASIS OF TORT CLAIMS. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK FELICIA GREEN; COURT REPORTER MELANIE GHENO, CSR NO. 7489; DEPT. 302. (302/EHG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED AS MOOT IN LIGHT OF THE RULING ON DEMURRER. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK FELICIA GREEN; COURT REPORTER MELANIE GHENO, CSR NO. 7489; DEPT. 302. (302/EHG)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DIANE E. PRITCHARD RE DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STARS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING DEMURRER FOR HEARING WITHIN 35 DAYS OF FILING PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1320(D) (TRANSACTION ID # 15118109) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 15118047) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR") (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15118036) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR") HEARING SET FOR NOV-18-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF DANIEL DEMETRISS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15118036) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 15118036) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAJESTIC HALL LLC D/B/A THE SEA STAR (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SEA STAR BAR") (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 57143544) FILED BY ATTORNEY CANTOR, ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF DEMETRIS, DANIEL AS TO DEFENDANT SANCHEZ, COURTNEY SEA STAR BAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15082024), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEMETRIS, DANIEL SERVED MAR-23-2015, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT SEA STAR BAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAMATION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEMETRIS, DANIEL AS TO DEFENDANT SANCHEZ, COURTNEY SEA STAR BAR DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-19-2015 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-18-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-27-2015 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

mqmm&mmmmwmqmm&wgmg

MICHAEL S. BURKE (SBN 150062) DIANE E. PRITCHARD (SBN 96999)

| VOGL MEREDITH BURKE LLP

456 Montgomery Street, 20™ Floor San Francisco, California 94104 Telephone: (415) 398-0200 ENDORSET Facsimile: (415) 398-2820 DORSED nburke bllp.con

Superior Court of Bal; County of San Franmggga

JUN 112015

Attorneys for Defendant MAIJESTIC HALL LLC d/b/a THE SEA STAR ERK OF THE COURT (erroneously sued herein as “Sea Star Bar”) BY: _ . SEAN KANE

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DANIEL DEMETRIS; ) Case No. CGC-15-544778 | ) | | o Plaintiff, ) [PROPOSED] ORDER ON DEFENDANT ) MAJESTIC HALL LLC d/b/a THE SEA STAR’S V8. ) EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER

- - | ) SETTING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED

COURTNEY SANCHEZ, and SEA STAR ) COMPLAINT FOR HEARING WITHIN 35 DAYS BAR, and DOES 1-10 ) OF FILING PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE ) OF COURT 3.1320(d) Defendant. ) ) Date: June 11, 2015 ) Time: 11:00 a.m. ) Dept: 302 ) Date of Filing of Action: March 17, 2015 )} Trnal Date: Not Set

This matter having come before the Court on the application of defendant Majestic Hall LLC

d/b/a The Sea Star for an order setting its demurrer to plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint for hearing

on July 14, 2015 or as soon thereafter as the Court is available, and after full consideration of the papers filed and arguments presented and the record in this matter, and good cause being shown,

IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: