This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:23:54 (UTC).

DANIEL A DAVIS VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2007 DANIEL A DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4380

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS, DANIEL A

Defendants

DANA CORPORATION (NOW KNOWN AS DANA COMPANIES, LLC)

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

SUGDEN ENGINEERING CO.

DANA CORPORATION

GRINNELL LLC

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.

FAMILIAN CORPORATION

ATLAS HEATING AND VENTILATING COMPANY, LTD.

CRANE CO.

DOES 1-8500

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

GREFCO, INC.

ADVOCATE MINES, LTD.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

SHELL OIL COMPANY

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GILBERT, PETER RAY

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610-3614

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

WAGMAN, BRUCE A

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market,, Spear St. Tower, 32Nd Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94105

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN LLP

101 Second St., Ste 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105-3606

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

PFALZER, THOMAS E

Attorney at MCNAMARA, DODGE, NEY, BEATTY, SLATTERY, PFALZER, BORGES & BROTHERS LLP

1211 Newell Avenue, P.O. Box 5288

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ESTRADA, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at VASQUEZ ESTRADA & DUMONT LLPCOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth Street, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16513611) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC., TO PLAINTIFF???S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16605888) FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION, N.A., INC. (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Warren Pumps, LLCs Objection to Assignment of Commissioner for Trial

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE / OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT OF COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16674880) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16712021) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16782421) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

Answer of Defendant Republic Supply Company to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury and Request for Jury Trial- Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16875644) FILED BY DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY ONLY

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25002069) AS TO DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES LLCS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS OFFER TO COMPROMISE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 998

DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES LLCS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS OFFER TO COMPROMISE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 998 (TRANSACTION ID # 25629353)

DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 25899028) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal (as to ABHI-Crockett, Inc.)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26242696) AS TO DEFENDANT ABHI-CROCKETT, INC.

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 26932279) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVIS, DANIEL A

DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 27035747) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 27090520) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Def. Santa Fe Braun, Incs Notice of Entry of Dismissal & POS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 27735904) FILED BY DEFENDANT SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (NO COPY, NO SASE)

Request for Dismissal of Complaint with prejudice as to Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC and Coltec Industries Inc. only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28170743) AS TO DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 28272941) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56265119)

184 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014. DISMISSAL FILED 10/29/14. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56265119)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO MAR-12-2016 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVIS, DANIEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-13-2012 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR THE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO THE ONLY REMAINING DEFENDANT, PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36410886) AS TO DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 35020301) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
203 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16540690) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16524730) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16522638) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16513611) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16493968) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16493859) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16439857) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVIS, DANIEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVIS, DANIEL A AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, G, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less