This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:49:03 (UTC).

DAN KWELBERG et al VS. AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2007 DAN KWELBERG filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4275

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KWELBERG, DAN

KWELBERG, ELIZABETH F

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

STOCKHAM VALVE & FITTINGS, INC. FKA SVI CORPORATION

NIBCO INC.

AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

YARWAY CORPORATION

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

DOES 1-800

AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, SUED HEREIN AS AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FKA AND SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERON MERGER AND AMERON INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

CRANE CO.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

SHELL OIL COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO SHELL CHEMICAL COMPANY

TRANE USA, INC./FKA AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

OAKFABCO, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SII TO KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATIN

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANLEY, DEAN A

Attorney at PAUL HANLEY & HARLEY LLP

1608 Fourth Street, Suite 300

Berkeley, CA 94710

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

WATSON, SUSAN ARTHUR

Attorney at HARRINGTON, FOXX, DUBROW & CANTER, LLP

650 California Street, 19Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94108

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Ctr., # 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID BROWN RAYSMAN & STEINER LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BROWN, EUGENE

Attorney at FILICE, BROWN, EASSA & MCLEOD, LLP

1999 Harrison St. 18Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCLEOD, BRUCE EDWIN

Attorney at FILICE BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLPLAKE MERRITT PLAZA

1999 Harrison St., 18Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

Other Attorneys

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM HENRY

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & ASSOCIATES, LLP

One Kaiser Plaza, Suite 625

Oakland, CA 94612

HILLYARD, MARY KIRK

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.S OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL

DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.S OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16036036) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

ExxonMobil Oil Corporations Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16366045) FILED BY DEFENDANT EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS MOBILE OIL CORPORATION

ANSWER OF NIBCO INC TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16872643) FILED BY DEFENDANT NIBCO INC. (Fee:335.00)

DEFENANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE

OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE (TRANSACTION ID # 17611960) FILED BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20109536) AS TO DEFENDANT PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP INC.

1. NOTICE OF DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION;

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21822322) FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY HEARING SET FOR DEC-19-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:200.00)

STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEFING DATES ON DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

FILING FEE PAID ON STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEFING DATES ON DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 22770949) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWELBERG, DAN KWELBERG, ELIZABETH F (Fee:20.00)

INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE

INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 23259704) FILED BY DEFENDANT OAKFABCO, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SII TO KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATIN

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 27342103) FILED BY DEFENDANT YARWAY CORPORATION

DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16036036) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.???S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.???S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16082974) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE TRUE NAMES OF DEFENDANTS FOR FICTITIOUS DOES

DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES OF CERTAIN ISSUES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 21832122) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF CHARLES AY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF CHARLES AY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 22785720) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWELBERG, DAN KWELBERG, ELIZABETH F

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 22896963) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Trane US, Inc. fka American Standard, Inc.s Index to Motions in Limine

INDEX TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 23220630) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRANE USA, INC./FKA AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23474236) AS TO DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

PLAINTIFFS INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE

PLAINTIFFS INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 30161057) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWELBERG, DAN KWELBERG, ELIZABETH F

240 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2010
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-30-2010. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-26-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-30-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REPRESENTED THAT A DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION IS PENDING IN LEXISNEXIS. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32844148) AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AND ENTIRE ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 32796052)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32639107) AS TO DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-29-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-26-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. DISMISSAL IS PENDING IN LEXISNEXIS. NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED IF THE FILING IS ACCEPTED BY THE NEXT HEARING DATE. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS OF APR-12-2010 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION ON JUL-29-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. MATTER REPORTED TO DEPT. 603 THAT THE CASE SETTLED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31333419) AS TO DEFENDANT OAKFABCO, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SII TO KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-24-2010 CONTINUED TO MAY-28-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN 603. PARTIES TO ADVISE MS. LY STATUS RE EXHAUSTION OF SETTLEMENT EFFORTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-17-2010 CONTINUED TO MAY-24-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN 603

    Read MoreRead Less
287 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15812557) FILED BY DEFENDANT DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15785183) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO SHELL CHEMICAL COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE TRUE NAMES OF DEFENDANTS FOR FICTITIOUS DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE TRUE NAMES OF DEFENDANTS FOR FICTITIOUS DOES (TRANSACTION ID # 15748349) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWELBERG, DAN KWELBERG, ELIZABETH F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MATT STONECIPHER IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15719755) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWELBERG, DAN KWELBERG, ELIZABETH F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER E. CLAY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15719755) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWELBERG, DAN KWELBERG, ELIZABETH F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15719755) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWELBERG, DAN KWELBERG, ELIZABETH F (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWELBERG, DAN KWELBERG, ELIZABETH F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWELBERG, DAN KWELBERG, ELIZABETH F AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. DOES 1-800 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-18-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NIBCO Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where YARWAY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where OAKFABCO, INC. is a litigant