This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 19:41:03 (UTC).

DAN GOIN VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2006 DAN GOIN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6638

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

NIBCO INC.

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

THE WM. POWEL COMPANY

DOES 1-8500; AND SEE ATTACHED LIST

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

CRANE CO.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

SVI CORPORATION

VIACOM CORPORATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

KIRBY, JOHN KENELM

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

YOUNG, DENNIS MICHAEL

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD

1111 Broadway - 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

BUTY, MADELINE L

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

MURRAY, JAMES G.

Attorney at PRINDLE DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, Fourth Floor, P.O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBON BISGAARD & SMITH

One Sansome Street; Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, S-2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOIN, DAN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I OTHER ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500; AND SEE ATTACHED LIST SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-18-2007 (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Lamons Gasket Companys Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Compl

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13065466) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 13065466) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18093608) AS TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

amendment to complaint

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18263863) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CRANE CO.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CRANE CO.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 18477658) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Answer of Defendant Special Electric Company, Inc. to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury and Request for Jury Trial-Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18655134) FILED BY DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. SUED HEREIN AS DOE #2 (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT THE SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.???S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SEVER CASE FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SEVER CASE FOR TRIAL, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 18932819) FILED BY DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. SUED HEREIN AS DOE #2 HEARING SET FOR APR-08-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:40.00)

PLAINTIFF???S STATEMENT OF CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. MOTION TO SEVER OR CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

STATEMENT OF CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. MOTION TO SEVER OR CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 19140455) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOIN, DAN

Goin Dismissal as to Special Electric

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20534730) AS TO DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21633347) AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BENDIX CORPORATION, SUED HEREIN AS HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 22740207) FILED BY ATTORNEY GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

NOTICE OF DISSOLUTION OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AND RESTORATION TO THE TRIAL CALENDAR

NOTICE OF DISSOLUTION OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AND RESTORATION TO THE TRIAL CALENDAR (TRANSACTION ID # 26264876) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOIN, DAN

DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE FOR A COURT ORDER REQUIRING THE PROSPECTIVE JURORS TO COMPLETE A JURY QUESTIONNAIRE PRIOR TO VOIR DIRE MIL 1

MOTION IN LIMINE FOR A COURT ORDER REQUIRING THE PROSPECTIVE JURORS TO COMPLETE A JURY QUESTIONNAIRE PRIOR TO VOIR DIRE MIL 1 (TRANSACTION ID # 31198237) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, WITNESSES, AND DOCUMENTS NOT DISCLOSED IN PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO FOSTER WHEELER LLCS DISCOVERY MIL 10

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, WITNESSES, AND DOCUMENTS NOT DISCLOSED IN PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO FOSTER WHEELER LLCS DISCOVERY MIL 10 (TRANSACTION ID # 31198237) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING REGARDING PLAINTIFFS PAIN AND SUFFERING MIL 21

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING REGARDING PLAINTIFFS PAIN AND SUFFERING MIL 21 (TRANSACTION ID # 31198237) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING APPLICABILITY OF GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR DEFENSE 36

TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING APPLICABILITY OF GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR DEFENSE 36 (TRANSACTION ID # 31198237) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC only. Each party to bear its own costs.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36244888) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2011
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36619519)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36244888) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-17-2010 TO JAN-27-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34066007) AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-30-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-17-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM MASTER CALENDAR ASBESTOS JURY TO AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET ON SEP-30-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 FOR FILING OF A DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REPORTED TO DEPT. 603 THAT THE CASE SETTLED. (206).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • REFERRED TO ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT MANAGER ON 6/1/10 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT. 603. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND TRIAL BRIEFS; MOTIONS IN LIMINE; TRIAL BRIEFS TRIAL WITNESS LIST AND TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 31198237) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
175 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 13148805) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13148805) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13070315) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 13065466) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 13065466) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 13065466) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13065466) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2006
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOIN, DAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOIN, DAN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I OTHER ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500; AND SEE ATTACHED LIST SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-18-2007 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WM. POWEL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SVI CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NIBCO Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PLANT INSULATION, LLC, DBA/AKA PLANT INSULATION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant