Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 17:33:17 (UTC).

CYNTHIA COX VS. BRADLEY B OLDENBROOK et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2011 CYNTHIA COX filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRADLEY B OLDENBROOK. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6104

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COX, CYNTHIA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NABI CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING

ADRIYL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

NABI CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING, INC. DBA NABI CONSTRUCTION (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS NABI CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING)

ADRIYL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

OLDENBROOK, BRADLEY B

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

ADRIYL DESIGN CENTERS, INC.

ADRIYL DESIGN CENTER

Cross Defendants

ROES 1 THROUGH 100

OLDENBROOK, BRADLEY B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOENBERGER, RICHARD HENRY

Attorney at WALKUP, MELODIA, KELLY & SCHOENBERGER; A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108-2615

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

O'MEARA, JOHN V.

Attorney at BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

21271 Burbank Blvd., Ste 110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

JACOBSEN, KAREN L

Attorney at JACOBSEN & MCELROY

2401 American River Drive, Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

MONGAN, LEILA K.

GERCHOW, MICHAEL A

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

1390 Market Street, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

MERIDA, SONIA C

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANTANA & HART

71 Stevenson St Ste 700

San Francisico, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA AS TO DEFENDANT OLDENBROOK, BRADLEY B ADRIYL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, INC. ADRIYL DESIGN CENTERS, INC. NABI CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-27-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-23-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-12-2012 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA SERVED DEC-01-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ADRIYL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA SERVED DEC-01-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ADRIYL DESIGN CENTERS, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA SERVED DEC-02-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA SERVED DEC-02-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NABI CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO-TEMPORE AT TRIAL PER LR 6.1(C) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-10-2014. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 2/21/14. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JUN-17-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION AND RESPONSE OF SARA M PETERS RE DISMISSAL HEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-17-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF RICHARD H. SCHOENBERGER IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT OLDENBROOK, BRADLEY B ADRIYL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT ADRIYL DESIGN CENTERS, INC.

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY OLDENBROOK, BRADLEY B, ADRIYL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

Order Dismissing Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

BALANCE OF CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AUG-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • BALANCE OF CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AUG-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-19-2014 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY OLDENBROOK, BRADLEY B, ADRIYL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT ADRIYL DESIGN CENTERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT OLDENBROOK, BRADLEY B ADRIYL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF RICHARD H. SCHOENBERGER IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-17-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND RESPONSE OF SARA M PETERS RE DISMISSAL HEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-10-2014. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 2/21/14. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JUN-17-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA SERVED JAN-25-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT OLDENBROOK, BRADLEY B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO-TEMPORE AT TRIAL PER LR 6.1(C) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA SERVED DEC-02-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NABI CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA SERVED DEC-02-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA SERVED DEC-01-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ADRIYL DESIGN CENTERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA SERVED DEC-01-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ADRIYL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COX, CYNTHIA AS TO DEFENDANT OLDENBROOK, BRADLEY B ADRIYL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, INC. ADRIYL DESIGN CENTERS, INC. NABI CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-27-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-23-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-12-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOENBERGER RICHARD H