This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2022 at 19:04:18 (UTC).

CURTIS CHUDE ET AL VS. MATTHEW M MARTINEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 CURTIS CHUDE filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MATTHEW M MARTINEZ. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES F. HAINES, GARRETT L. WONG and RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3242

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

CHARLES F. HAINES

GARRETT L. WONG

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL

HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN

KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL

CHUDE, CURTIS

Defendants

KWON, DIANA J AN INDIVIDUAL

MANGAMPAT, MARK AN INDIVIDUAL

MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M AN INDIVIDUAL

MARK MANGAMPAT DBA M. PROPERTIES

DOES 1 TO 10

MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M.

KWON, DIANA J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PURTELL, THOMAS W

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF THOMA W.J. PURTELL

534 Pacific Ave, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorneys

LAGASSE, TRACI S.

Attorney at ANDREWS LAGASSE BRANCH + BELL LLP

1 Sansome Street, 35Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

BRYDON, JOHN R

Attorney at DEMLER, ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND, LLP

601 California Street, Suite 704

San Francisco, CA 94108

MARQUEZ, JAK STEVEN

Attorney at DOWLING & MARQUEZ, LLP

625 Market Street, 4Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 66603143) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN AS TO DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 66603143) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN AS TO DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66077970) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66077970) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. (PREVIOUSLY TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON OCT. 29, 2020)

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. (PREVIOUSLY TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON OCT. 29, 2020)

DECLARATION OF DECLARATION OF CURTIS F. DOWLING IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66062172) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

DECLARATION OF DECLARATION OF CURTIS F. DOWLING IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66062172) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66048006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66048006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN

DECLARATION OF THOMAS W. J. PURTELL, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF REPLY OF PLAINTIFFS CURTIS CHUDE, NICHOLAS KANILLOPOOLOS, ELISEO LIWAG, AND ESTEVAN HINOJOSA TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66048006) FILED B

DECLARATION OF THOMAS W. J. PURTELL, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF REPLY OF PLAINTIFFS CURTIS CHUDE, NICHOLAS KANILLOPOOLOS, ELISEO LIWAG, AND ESTEVAN HINOJOSA TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66048006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN

OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE OF THE DECLARATIONS OF CURTIS F. DOWLING, JAK MARQUEZ, DAVID SEMEL, MATTHEW M. MARTINEZ AND MARGARET LESNIAK (TRANSACTION ID # 66048006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, E

OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE OF THE DECLARATIONS OF CURTIS F. DOWLING, JAK MARQUEZ, DAVID SEMEL, MATTHEW M. MARTINEZ AND MARGARET LESNIAK (TRANSACTION ID # 66048006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN

REPLY OF PLAINTIFFS CURTIS CHUDE, NICHOLAS KANILLOPOOLOS, ELISEO LIWAG, AND ESTEVAN HINOJOSA TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66048006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDI

REPLY OF PLAINTIFFS CURTIS CHUDE, NICHOLAS KANILLOPOOLOS, ELISEO LIWAG, AND ESTEVAN HINOJOSA TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66048006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN

CORRECTED DECLARATION OF CURTIS F. DOWLING IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030811) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

CORRECTED DECLARATION OF CURTIS F. DOWLING IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030811) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030811) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030811) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

DECLARATION OF CURTIS F. DOWLING IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030749) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

DECLARATION OF CURTIS F. DOWLING IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030749) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW M. MARTINEZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW M. MARTINEZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

DECLARATION OF DAVID SEMEL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

DECLARATION OF DAVID SEMEL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

DECLARATION OF MARGARET LESNIAK IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

DECLARATION OF MARGARET LESNIAK IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

DECLARATION OF JAK MARQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

DECLARATION OF JAK MARQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66030748) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 65971498) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 65971498) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 66603143) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN AS TO DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketREAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES PREVIOUSLY TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON 10-29-20, GRANTED. (501/CFH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66077970) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. (PREVIOUSLY TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON OCT. 29, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketREAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION, 501, PLAINTIFF CURTIS CHUDE, NICHOLAS KANILLOPOOLOS, ELISEO LIWAG, ESTEVAN HINOJOSA PLAINTIFFS CURTIS CHUDE, NICHOLAS KANILLOPOOLOS, ELISEO LIWAG, AND ESTEVAN HINOJOSAS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES IS TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. JUDGE: CHARLES F. HAINES, CLERK: N. WONG, NOT REPORTED. (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): Plaintiffs Curtis Chude, Nicholas Kanillopoolos, Eliseo Liwag, And Estevan Hinojosas Notice Of Motion And Motion For Attorneys Fees Off Calendar Nov-13-2020 Text Ruling MINI MINUTES: Appearances via Courtcall: Jak Marquez, Esq., 415-977-0444, appearing for Jane Doe, Defendant. Thomas Purtell and James O'Brien, Esq., appearing in person,415-722-6291, appearing for Curtis Chude, Plaintiff ARGUED. Mr. Purtell stated that he contested to the tentative ruling, provided case background and presented oral argument in support of his position. Mr. Marquez argued that plaintiff's began to prepare for trial two months ahead of time. The Court having reviewed the pleadings and having heard oral argument adopts the tentative ruling as follows: PLAINTIFF CURTIS CHUDE, NICHOLAS KANILLOPOOLOS, ELISEO LIWAG, ESTEVAN HINOJOSA Plaintiffs Curtis Chude, Nicholas Kanillopoolos, Eliseo Liwag, And Estevan Hinojosas Notice Of Motion And Motion For Attorneys Fees is taken under submission. Judge: Charles F. Haines, Clerk: N. Wong, Not Reported. (D501); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 501; Judge Name: CHARLES F. HAINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR OCT-29-2020 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DECLARATION OF CURTIS F. DOWLING IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66062172) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66048006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF THOMAS W. J. PURTELL, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF REPLY OF PLAINTIFFS CURTIS CHUDE, NICHOLAS KANILLOPOOLOS, ELISEO LIWAG, AND ESTEVAN HINOJOSA TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 66048006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63323698) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63261204) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARK MANGAMPAT DBA M. PROPERTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $900; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W6619416F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DAVID J GIBSON SEEKING 30 DAY CONTINUANCE TO FILE DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (TRANSACTION ID # 100068716) FILED BY DEFENDANT MANGAMPAT, MARK AN INDIVIDUAL MARK MANGAMPAT DBA M. PROPERTIES; Fee: $900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $900; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R9219408F011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63126674) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63126674) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M. KWON, DIANA J.; Fee: $900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $450; Payment Type: CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number: W0819128F029

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHUDE, CURTIS KANILLOPOOLOS, NICHOLAS AN INDIVIDUAL LIWAG, ELISEO AN INDIVIDUAL HINOJOSA, ESTEVAN AS TO DEFENDANT MARTINEZ, MATTHEW M AN INDIVIDUAL KWON, DIANA J AN INDIVIDUAL MANGAMPAT, MARK AN INDIVIDUAL MARK MANGAMPAT DBA M. PROPERTIES DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-29-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-10-2019; Fee: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******3242
Case Title:CURTIS CHUDE ET AL VS. MATTHEW M MARTINEZ ET AL
Court Date:OCT-29-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiffs Curtis Chude, Nicholas Kanillopoolos, Eliseo Liwag, And Estevan Hinojosas Notice Of Motion And Motion For Attorneys Fees
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for October 29, 2020 line 5.PLAINTIFF CURTIS CHUDE, NICHOLAS KANILLOPOOLOS, ELISEO LIWAG, ESTEVAN HINOJOSA Plaintiffs Curtis Chude, Nicholas Kanillopoolos, Eliseo Liwag, And Estevan Hinojosas Notice Of Motion And Motion For Attorneys Feesis GRANTED in the amount of $86,800 (217 hours at $400/hour) for reasonable and necessary fees incurred in this action, including filing of the action, discovery, applicable dispute resolution efforts, and motion practice. =(501/CFH)


Case Number:*******3242
Case Title:CURTIS CHUDE ET AL VS. MATTHEW M MARTINEZ ET AL
Court Date:NOV-27-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement
Rulings:Matter on the Law & Motion Calendar for Wednesday, November 27, 2019, Line 2, DEFENDANT MARK MANGAMPAT DBA M. PROPERTIES'S Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement.Grant. No opposition filed. The court will execute the proposed order. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =(302/RBU)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PURTELL, THOMAS W.