This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 10:51:30 (UTC).

CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE VS. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4324

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

AT BAY APPLIANCES, INC.

ACTIVE APPLIANCES INC.

DOES 1 TO 10

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

MOES 1 THROUGH 20

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE AS TO DEFENDANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. AT BAY APPLIANCES, INC. ACTIVE APPLIANCES INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-29-2018 CONTINUED TO OCT-17-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PARTIES TO OBTAIN ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100040045) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100047570) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100032975), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE SERVED MAR-02-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

Request for dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100032217) AS TO DEFENDANT ACTIVE APPLIANCES INC.

Stipulation to Consolidate All Actions

STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE ALL ACTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 100040045) FILED BY CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Plaintiff CSAAs Ex Parte Application for Order to Consolidate Related

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 100047570) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Declaration of Dorothy Tran in support of Plaintiff CSAAs Ex Parte App

DECLARATION OF DOROTHY TRAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 100047570) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.s Cross-Complaint for Equitable Indem

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61889662) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT AT BAY APPLIANCES, INC. MOES 1 THROUGH 20

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-29-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PARTIES TO FILE ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of related case

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 100032165) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-17-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE# 561537. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Plaintiff CSAAs Ex

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 100047570) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61862635) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62341687) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-18-564324 WITH CASE CGC-17-561537

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1518910M007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4918625S007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1518406F014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1518214F016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-17-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE# 561537. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • PARTIES/ATTORNEYS FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE CGC-18-564324 ADDED TO LEAD CASE CGC-17-561537 FOR MAILING OF COURT NOTICES. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-18-564324 WITH CASE CGC-17-561537; ALL FURTHER ENTRIES UNDER CASE CGC-17-561537

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100047570) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DOROTHY TRAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 100047570) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 100047570) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • FEE PAID ON: STIP & [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ALL ACTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 100040045) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Fee:$20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE ALL ACTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 100040045) FILED BY CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61889662) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT AT BAY APPLIANCES, INC. MOES 1 THROUGH 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61862635) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033392), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE SERVED MAR-08-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION, MAILING DATE MAR-09-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT AT BAY APPLIANCES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100032975), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE SERVED MAR-02-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100032217) AS TO DEFENDANT ACTIVE APPLIANCES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 100032165) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE AS TO DEFENDANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. AT BAY APPLIANCES, INC. ACTIVE APPLIANCES INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.