Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 04:12:37 (UTC).

CRISTINA AGUILAR FLOREANO VS. MARIO NUNEZ

Case Summary

On 10/29/2014 CRISTINA AGUILAR FLOREANO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARIO NUNEZ. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2587

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FLOREANO, CRISTINA AGUILAR

San Pablo, CA 94806

Respondent

NUNEZ, MARIO

San Francisco, CA 94117

Minor

NUNEZ AGUILAR, ISABEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS OCT-14-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT NUNEZ, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • STIPULATION AND MUTUAL WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT NUNEZ, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • CASE RESOLUTION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER FLOREANO, CRISTINA AGUILAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER FLOREANO, CRISTINA AGUILAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER FLOREANO, CRISTINA AGUILAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: NOV-12-2014 FILED BY PETITIONER FLOREANO, CRISTINA AGUILAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • NOTICE OF NATURE OF AVAILABILITY OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION METHODS IN FAMILY LAW MATTERS FILED BY PETITIONER FLOREANO, CRISTINA AGUILAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER FLOREANO, CRISTINA AGUILAR ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER FLOREANO, CRISTINA AGUILAR AS TO RESPONDENT NUNEZ, MARIO SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less