Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 22:32:39 (UTC).

CRAIG CHIAPPONE VS. MARIANA ZUZUNAGA-CHIAPPONE *CONS W/ FCS-14-349463*

Case Summary

On 08/26/2014 CRAIG CHIAPPONE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARIANA ZUZUNAGA-CHIAPPONE CONS W/ FCS-14-349463. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2177

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHIAPPONE, CRAIG

San Francisco, CA 94117

Respondent

ZUZUNAGA-CHIAPPONE, MARIANA

San Francisco, CA 94109

Minor

CHIAPPONE, KIARA Z

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MUSSALLEM, ALEXANDRA

Attorney at MAPLE & MUSSALLEM LLP

500 Sansome Street Ste 220

San Francisco, CA 94111

RUSSELL, LANCE ARTHUR

MAH, SHARON FONG

RAPOPORT, LISSA L

Respondent Attorneys

RADOS, RICHARD PATRICK

BLEY, STEPHEN BRUCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2015
  • OFF CALENDAR, COMPLIED WITH CASE RESOLUTION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • THE COURT ORDERS THE CONSOLIDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CHANGE OF VENUE FILED BY PETITIONER CHIAPPONE, CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • REPLY DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER SET FOR JULY 22, 2014 AT 8:30AM IN DEPT. H FILED BY RESPONDENT ZUZUNAGA-CHIAPPONE, MARIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT ZUZUNAGA-CHIAPPONE, MARIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER ON CALENDAR ON MAY-30-2014 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT H FILED BY RESPONDENT ZUZUNAGA-CHIAPPONE, MARIANA AS TO PETITIONER CHIAPPONE, CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER CHIAPPONE, CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER TO SET ASIDE ORDER FOR VENUE CHANGE BASED ON LACK OF PROPER SERVICE SET FOR 05/30/2014 AT 8:30AM IN DEPT. H FILED BY PETITIONER CHIAPPONE, CRAIG AS TO RESPONDENT ZUZUNAGA-CHIAPPONE, MARIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY PETITIONER CHIAPPONE, CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2014
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RESPONDENT ZUZUNAGA-CHIAPPONE, MARIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER CHIAPPONE, CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT ZUZUNAGA-CHIAPPONE, MARIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • DECLARATION OF LISSA L. RAPOPORT RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AND LATE FILING OF NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY PETITIONER CHIAPPONE, CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY RESPONDENT ZUZUNAGA-CHIAPPONE, MARIANA AS TO PETITIONER CHIAPPONE, CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: JAN-10-2006, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE: FEB-26-2006 FILED BY PETITIONER CHIAPPONE, CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION TRANSFERRED FROM MARIN COUNTY FILED BY PETITIONER CHIAPPONE, CRAIG AS TO RESPONDENT ZUZUNAGA-CHIAPPONE, MARIANA SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUSSALLEM, ALEXANDRA