This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 01:38:21 (UTC).

COURTNEY BURRIS VS. UNITED BRANDS, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 COURTNEY BURRIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against UNITED BRANDS, INC . This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4611

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURRIS, COURTNEY

Defendants

UNITED BRANDS, INC., DBA WHIP-IT

UNITED BRANDS PRODUCTS DESIGN DEVELOPMENT AND MARKETING, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 30, INCLUSIVE

A-1 SMOKE SHOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDI, THOMAS JOHN

Attorney at THE BRANDI LAW FIRM

354 Pine Street, Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BURRIS, COURTNEY AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED BRANDS, INC., DBA WHIP-IT UNITED BRANDS PRODUCTS DESIGN DEVELOPMENT AND MARKETING, INC. A-1 SMOKE SHOP DOES 1 THROUGH 30, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-28-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-27-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-05-2020

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF BURRIS, COURTNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF BURRIS, COURTNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1120603F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BURRIS, COURTNEY AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED BRANDS, INC., DBA WHIP-IT UNITED BRANDS PRODUCTS DESIGN DEVELOPMENT AND MARKETING, INC. A-1 SMOKE SHOP DOES 1 THROUGH 30, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-28-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-27-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-05-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4611
Case Title:COURTNEY BURRIS VS. UNITED BRANDS, INC., ET AL
Court Date:SEP-13-2021 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Informal Discovery Conference
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Monday, September 13, 2021, Line 5, Informal Discovery Conference.Parties to appear.For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number. =(302/JPT)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED BRANDS PRODUCTS DESIGN, DEVELOPMENT AND MARKETING, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDI, THOMAS J.