Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/12/2018 at 22:53:57 (UTC).

COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC. VS. JAMES D. BANKS ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMES D BANKS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD E. QUIDACHAY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7984

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC.

Defendants, Petitioners and Appellants

BANKS, JAMES D.

San Francisco, CA 94134

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

San Francisco, CA 94134

Other

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

KOZUBAL, JOANNA

Attorney at JOANNA KOZUBAL

375 Potrero Avenue #5

San Francisco, CA 94103

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER DENYING DEFT JAMES D BANKS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D.

ORDER

ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR FILING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; MOTION TO BE HEARD ON 5/10/17, FILED AND PERSONALLY SERVED BY 4PM ON 5/4/17; OPPOS TO BE FILED AND PERSOANALLY SERVED NO LATER THAN 5/8/17. NO WRITTEN REPLY. (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR FILING MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CLERKS JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER - POSSESSION ONLY

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D. THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 306 GAMBIER STREET, SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94134 SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, **APPLIES TO ANY/ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS.**

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (AMENDED), PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC. SERVED MAR-08-2017, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $100.00 FILED BY PLAINTIFF COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF RESTITUTION OF MONIES AND CANCELLATION FILED BY DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY APPELLANT BANKS, JAMES D.

ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION

ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION STAYED UNTIL JUN-06-2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT

NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (PROPOSED STATEMENT ON APPEAL ATTACHED) FILED BY APPELLANT BANKS, JAMES D.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D.

ORDER

ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT JAMES D. BANKS' DEMURRER (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

Notice to Defendants

NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • Payment : WRIT ISSUED; Amount : $25; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W1618A02W001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : W1618914M019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W1618905M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Payment : RENT DEPOSIT; Amount : $3000; Payment Type : MONEY ORDER; Receipt Number : W2118731R001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Payment : RENT DEPOSIT; Amount : $3000; Payment Type : MONEY ORDER; Receipt Number : R4918702R013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Payment : RENT DEPOSIT; Amount : $3000; Payment Type : MONEY ORDER; Receipt Number : W1618530R019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Payment : RENT DEPOSIT; Amount : $3000; Payment Type : MONEY ORDER; Receipt Number : R4918430R007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Payment : RENT DEPOSIT; Amount : $3000; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R9218329R018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Payment : EX PARTE MOTION; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : W2818328E001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Payment : RENT DEPOSIT; Amount : $3000; Payment Type : MONEY ORDER; Receipt Number : R4918227R023

    Read MoreRead Less
150 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER, MEMO OF P&A&S, REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D. SERVED MAR-13-2017, MAIL AS TO PLAINTIFF COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC. AS TO DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC. AS TO DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE RE: (PES-15-298695); (CGC-15-548254); AND (CGC-16-550006). FILED BY DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D. HEARING SET FOR APR-11-2017 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:$225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COURTHOUSE VENTURES INC. AS TO DEFENDANT BANKS, JAMES D. DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:$240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COURTHOUSE VENTURES,INC.,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOZUBAL, JOANNA