This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 11:12:45 (UTC).

CORY NICOLAI VS. FRANK WINDOM et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2013 CORY NICOLAI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FRANK WINDOM. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD A. KRAMER, CYNTHIA M. LEE, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CHARLES F. HAINES, JOHN K. STEWART and RONALD E. QUIDACHAY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1141

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

RICHARD A. KRAMER

CYNTHIA M. LEE

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

CHARLES F. HAINES

JOHN K. STEWART

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

NICOLAI, CORY

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST ADVERSE

E-LOAN, INC.

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

WINDOM, FRANK

YARVIN, CURTIS G.

CITIMORTGAGE, INC.

DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE IN THE SUBJECT REAL PROPERTY

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NICOLAI, CORY

WINDOM, FRANK

YARVIN, CURTIS

ROES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

DOES 21-40, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BROWN DENNIS D

BROWN, DENNIS DEAN

111 N. Market St., #1010

San Jose, CA 95113

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MCGRAW, DAVE MILES

Attorney at FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

1550 Parkside Drive, Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

LOWENTHAL, JEFFREY HOWARD

Attorney at STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

One California Street, 3Rd Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94111

SOLAN, KEVIN MICHAEL

Attorney at SOLAN, PARK & ROBELLO LLP

354 Pine St, Fifth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

HAMMEL, SCOTT

Attorney at FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

1550 Parkside Drive, Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 945963531

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWN, DENNIS DEAN

111 N. Market St., #1010

San Jose, CA 95113

MCGRAW, DAVE MILES

Attorney at FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

1550 Parkside Drive, Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

LOWENTHAL, JEFFREY HOWARD

Attorney at STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

One California Street, 3Rd Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94111

SOLAN, KEVIN MICHAEL

Attorney at SOLAN, PARK & ROBELLO LLP

354 Pine St, Fifth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT DISMISSING FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY WITH PREJUDICE

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: DISMISSING DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY WITH PREJUDICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALT SUMM ADJ FILED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G. HEARING SET FOR JAN-30-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:500.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G.

Opposition to Yarvins Motion for Summary Judgment

OPPOSITION TO YARVINS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15022023) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NICOLAI, CORY

Declaration of Counsel in Opposition to Yarvins Motion for Summary Jud

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN OPPOSITION TO YARVINS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15022023) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NICOLAI, CORY

OPPOSITION TO YARVINS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

OPPOSITION TO YARVINS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15022164) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NICOLAI, CORY

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN OPPITION TO YARVINS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGE

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN OPPITION TO YARVINS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15022164) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NICOLAI, CORY

CURTIS G. YARVINS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT,

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO PLTFFS FIRST AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION AND X-CROSS COMPLAINANTS FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR QUIET TITLE - ADVERSE POSSESSION AND ALL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE THERETO (TRANSACTION ID # 15025058) FILED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING CURTIS G. YARVIN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (PREVAILING PARTY IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM AND DECLARATION

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56850721) FILED BY DEFENDANT WINDOM, FRANK

DECLARATION OF KEVIN M. SOLAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE SECOND (NEGLIGENCE) OR FOURTH (CONVERSION) CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFFS NICOLAIS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF KEVIN M. SOLAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE SECOND (NEGLIGENCE) OR FOURTH (CONVERSION) CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFFS NICOLAIS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56850721) FILED BY DEFENDANT WINDOM, FRANK

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2014
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2214B12M029

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Payment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1714918E013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1614519S013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R1614210J006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : W2113C30M013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2113C30F012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2113C16F050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2113906C024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R1613808M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1713617R031

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G. FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G. FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G. FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JUL-17-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G. (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT YARVIN, CURTIS G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT YARVIN, CURTIS G. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT NICOLAI, CORY WINDOM, FRANK ROES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT YARVIN, CURTIS G. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF NICOLAI, CORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NICOLAI, CORY AS TO DEFENDANT WINDOM, FRANK YARVIN, CURTIS G. FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY E-LOAN, INC. ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE IN THE SUBJECT REAL PROPERTY DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-02-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-17-2013 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less