This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:46:09 (UTC).

COREY J. GARDNER et al VS. HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 COREY J GARDNER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8431

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARDNER, COREY J.

San Francisco, CA 941192723

RYAN, DONALD

San Francisco, CA 941192723

Defendants

HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC.

SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL

SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL

THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 26 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BIRENBAUM, CHARLES S

Attorney at GREENBERT TRAURIG, LLP

Four Embarcadero Ctr, Ste 3000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD SERVED MAR-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD SERVED MAR-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: BIRENBAUM, CHARLES S SUBSTITUTED FOR BIRENBAUM, CHARLES S AS ATTORNEY FOR HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PRO PER ON APR-01-2014 THROUGH MAY-09-2014 FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY PRO PER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD

Case Managment Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15007074) FILED BY DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57536474) FILED BY DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD SERVED MAR-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC.

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PRO PER ON APR-11-2013 THROUGH APR-12-2013 APR-17 THRU APR-19-13 AND APR-25-13 FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY AND/OR DISMISS THE PROCEEDING; MEMO P/A; DECLARATIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-03-2013 CONTINUED TO FEB-05-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: BIRENBAUM, CHARLES S SUBSTITUTED FOR BIRENBAUM, CHARLES S AS ATTORNEY FOR THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-05-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-06-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-06-2014 CONTINUED TO FEB-04-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-04-2015 CONTINUED TO AUG-05-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58819998) FILED BY DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-03-2016 CONTINUED TO MAY-04-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF(S) TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINTLY) (TRANSACTION ID # 58400348) FILED BY DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-05-2015 CONTINUED TO FEB-03-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57536474) FILED BY DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-04-2015 CONTINUED TO AUG-05-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15007074) FILED BY DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-06-2014 CONTINUED TO FEB-04-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD SERVED MAR-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD SERVED MAR-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD SERVED MAR-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD SERVED MAR-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • DECLARATION TO VERIFIED COMPLT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDNER, COREY J. RYAN, DONALD AS TO DEFENDANT HORNBLOWER YACHTS, INC. SALVADOR, TRACY AN INDIVIDUAL SINGER, LEESA AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS, LARISA REILLY AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 26 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less