Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 19:04:03 (UTC).

CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A VS. MAJESTIC CAPITAL, LTD., A FOREIGN CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2010 CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MAJESTIC CAPITAL, LTD , A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, CYNTHIA M. LEE, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II, LORETTA GIORGI, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, ARLENE T. BORICK, TOMAR MASON, HAROLD E. KAHN, MARLA J. MILLER and CURTIS KARNOW. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6422

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

CYNTHIA M. LEE

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

LORETTA GIORGI

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

ARLENE T. BORICK

TOMAR MASON

HAROLD E. KAHN

MARLA J. MILLER

CURTIS KARNOW

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

COMPENSATION RISK MANAGERS, LLC

TOWERS WATSON AMERICA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIA BILITY COMPANY

COMPENSATION RISK MANAGERS OF CALIFORNIA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MAJESTIC CAPITAL, LTD., A FOREIGN CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRM HOLDINGS, LTD

MAJESTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TWIN BRIDGES (BERMUDA), LTD., A FOREIGN CORPORATION

EMB AMERICA LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMP ANY

CHAHINE, MOHAMMAD INDIVIDUALLY

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

Cross Defendants, Not Classified By Court and Cross Plaintiffs

OTTO, DAVID J AN INDIVIDUAL

SCARDINO, JAMES AN INDIVIDUAL

PAXIN, JIM

TOWERS WATSON AMERICA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIA BILITY COMPANY

VENNEKOLT, ROBERT

TOWERS WATSON AMERICA LLC. FORMELY EMB AMERICA LLC

THEODORA ORINGHER, P.C. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TWIN BRIDGES (BERMUDA), LTD., A FOREIGN CORPORATION

EMB AMERICA LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMP ANY

CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR

CALHOUN, ROBERT

CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DE LAMOS, JASON

THEODORA, ORINGHER, MILLER, & RICHMAN PC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHAHINE, MOHAMMAD INDIVIDUALLY

Other, Cross Defendant and Not Classified By Court

THEODORA ORINGHER, P.C. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

BELGUM, KARL DAVID

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941113600

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KLIER-ERLICH, RINA B

Attorney at MANNING & KASS, ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTER LLP

15Th Floor At 801 Tower, 801 Fouth Figueroa St

Los Angeles, CA 90017

MANGELS, ROBERT E

Attorney at JEFFER, MANGELS, BUTLER & MARMARO LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Seventh Floor

Los Angeles, CA 900674308

ALLISON, SUSAN

Attorney at JEFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th F

Los Angeles, CA 90067

SCHWARTZ, ROBERT A

Attorney at SCHWARTZ & DEUTSCH LLP

300 South Grand Ave Ste 3900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

SHIRLEY, DEUTCH D

Attorney at SCHWARTZ & DEUTSCH, LLP

300 South Grand Ave, Ste 3900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

DAVIS, CALVIN E.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

633 West Fifth St, 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

MUSFELT, DUANE CLARK

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

333 Bush St Ste 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

MORTON, RICHARD E.

Attorney at RICHARD E. MORTON, ESQ.

2050 Main Street, Ste 600

Irvine, CA 92614

LIROFF, H. ANN

71 Stevenson Street, 20Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94105

MATTHAI, EDITH

Attorney at ROBIE & MAYYHAI

500 S. Grand Ave Ste 1500

Los Angeles, CA 900712609

BELGUM, KARL DAVID

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941113600

CAMARENA 11, IGNASCIO C

Attorney at DIMALANTA CLARK, LLP

1580 Oakland Road Ste. C114

San Jose, CA 951312440

LENOCI, LISA A

Attorney at DIMALANTA CLARK LLP

1754 Technology Drive, Suite 234

San Jose, CA 95110

Cross Defendant, Other and Not Classified By Court Attorney

MATTHAI, EDITH

Attorney at ROBIE & MAYYHAI

500 S. Grand Ave Ste 1500

Los Angeles, CA 900712609

Other Attorneys

HASSID, ANDRE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ANDRE HASSID & ASSOCIATES

670 Augusta Drive

Moraga, CA 94556

BURR, ANNE M

Attorney at DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

GLAD, PAUL EDWARD

Attorney at SNR DENTON US LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94941

SPIELFOGEL, DANIEL J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL J SPEILFOGEL

2660 Townsgate Road, Ste 600

Westlake Village, CA 91361

FIELDS, CLIFFORD KERRY

Attorney at FIELDS LAW GROUP, LLP

115 S. Chaparral Court,, Suite 100

Anaheim, CA 92808

VAN RIPER, DAVID

Attorney at VAN RIPER LAW

1254 Irvine Blvd Ste 200

Tustin, CA 92780

 

Court Documents

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-07-2011 CONTINUED TO DEC-09-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HUDSON, RONALD INDIVIDUALLY

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR

ORDER

ORDER OVERRULING IN PART AND SUSTAINING IN PART DEMURRERS OF DEFENDANTS HICKEY, WALCZYK, AND TWIN BRIDGES (BERMUDA) LTD. TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOS. TO DEMURRER TO X-COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CHAHINE, MOHAMMAD INDIVIDUALLY

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT PAXIN, JIM HEIMERL, BOB (Fee:820.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE OPPOS FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CHAHINE, MOHAMMAD INDIVIDUALLY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY CAMARENA 11, IGNASCIO C

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (OF MOHAMAD CHAHINE'S) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT HICKEY JR, DANIEL G INDIVIDUALLY WALCZYK, CHESTER INDIVIDUALLY TWIN BRIDGES (BERMUDA),LTD., A FOREIGN CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION CONTESTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT APPLICATION OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ROBERT VENNEKOLT

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL NO. 3 AND 4 FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CHAHINE, MOHAMMAD INDIVIDUALLY HUDSON, RONALD INDIVIDUALLY

REPLY

REPLY REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT TOWERS WATSON AMERICA LLC. FORMELY EMB AMERICA LLC

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED BY DEFENDANT COMPENSATION RISK MANAGERS OF CALIFORNIA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY TWIN BRIDGES (BERMUDA), LTD., A FOREIGN CORPORATION HICKEY JR, DANIEL G INDIVIDUALLY WALCZYK, CHESTER INDIVIDUALLY COMPENSATION RISK MANAGERS, LLC

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE: APPLICATION FOR ORDER RE: GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTIN BROS./MARCOWALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CHAHINE, MOHAMMAD INDIVIDUALLY

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-10-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

294 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2013
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1513708C002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R1613611C017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W3613528C002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1513211M020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1513211M019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1513211M018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R1613131R025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R1613131M024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2112C21M063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R1612B08R036

    Read MoreRead Less
654 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR SERVED JAN-04-2011, MAIL ON DEFENDANT MAJESTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR SERVED JAN-11-2011, MAIL ON DEFENDANT TWIN BRIDGES (BERMUDA), LTD., A FOREIGN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR SERVED JAN-11-2011, MAIL ON DEFENDANT MAJESTIC CAPITAL, LTD., A FOREIGN CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRM HOLDINGS, LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR SERVED JAN-11-2011, MAIL ON DEFENDANT COMPENSATION RISK MANAGERS, LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR SERVED JAN-11-2011, MAIL ON DEFENDANT COMPENSATION RISK MANAGERS OF CALIFORNIA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR SERVED JAN-07-2011, MAIL ON DEFENDANT WALCZYK, CHESTER INDIVIDUALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR SERVED JAN-07-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HUDSON, RONALD INDIVIDUALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • BUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS ACCESS PROGRAM OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, BY BICKMORE RISK SERVICES AS CONSERVATOR AS TO DEFENDANT MAJESTIC CAPITAL, LTD., A FOREIGN CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRM HOLDINGS, LTD MAJESTIC USA CAPITAL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRM USA HOLDINGS, INC. COMPENSATION RISK MANAGERS OF CALIFORNIA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY COMPENSATION RISK MANAGERS, LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY MAJESTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TWIN BRIDGES (BERMUDA), LTD., A FOREIGN CORPORATION HICKEY JR, DANIEL G INDIVIDUALLY WALCZYK, CHESTER INDIVIDUALLY MARTIN BROS./MARCOWALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CHAHINE, MOHAMMAD INDIVIDUALLY SUPERIOR WALL SYSTEM, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HUDSON, RONALD INDIVIDUALLY DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-20-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-18-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-05-2011 (Fee:$410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASPIRE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THEODORA ORINGHER PC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL SPIELFOGEL LAW OFFICES OF