This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/12/2016 at 03:42:43 (UTC).

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC VS. JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2012 CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC , IN THE PUBLIC filed an Other lawsuit against JAY FRANCO SONS, INC , A NEW YORK CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3742

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST

Defendants

JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 20

JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEROUSHALMI, REUBEN

Attorney at YEROUSHALMI & ASSOCIATES

9100 Wilshire Blvd Ste 610E

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorney

SCHUDA, ROBERT S

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

300 South Grand Ave 14Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR MAR-10-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JAN-07-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-09-2014 CONTINUED TO JUL-09-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

CASEMANAGEMENTSTATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 14348010) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF YEROUSHALMI, REUBEN ON APR-15-2014 APR-21-14,JUN-4-14 FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-30-2013 CONTINUED TO APR-03-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-10-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC. AND DEFENDANT JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC. (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPROVE AND ENTER CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN CONSUMKER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., AND JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-27-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, MTN TO APPROVE AND ENTER CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC AND JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC AND INDEX OF EXHIBITS IS GRANTED, AFTER HAVING PREVIOUSLY TAKEN THE MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION. ORDER AFTER HEARING AND CONSENT JUDGMENT SIGNED AND MAILED TO PARTIES. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: SEAN KANE; REPORTER: MELANIE DAWN GHENO, CSR #7489; DEPT. 302. (302/EHG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JASON R. GIANVECCHIO (TRANSACTION ID # 15019123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR MAR-10-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JAN-07-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 14348010) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-03-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-02-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-03-2013 CONTINUED TO JUL-03-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-30-2013 CONTINUED TO APR-03-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC. (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST SERVED SEP-07-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT ON DEFENDANT JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST AS TO DEFENDANT JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-30-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-26-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-15-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******3742
Case Title:CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC VS. JAY FRANCO & SONS, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION et al
Court Date:JAN-27-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Approve And Enter Consent Judgment Between Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc And Jay Franco & Sons, Inc And Index Of Exhibits
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Monday, January 26, 2015, Line 5, PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., Motion To Approve And Enter Consent Judgment Between Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. And Jay Franco & Sons, Inc. And Index Of Exhibits.Hearing required. =(302/EHG)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jay Franco and Sons is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Schuda