This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2016 at 19:31:00 (UTC).

CONSERVATORSHIP OF JOHN PREWITT NELSON

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 CONSERVATORSHIP OF JOHN PREWITT NELSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6444

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservator

NELSON, DOUGLAS

Conservatee

NELSON, JOHN PREWITT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservator Attorney

NEVIN, JAMES PATRICK

305 Holly St.

Mill Valley, CA 94941

Conservatee Attorney

SULLIVAN, RUTH DOWNS

9Th Floor, 605 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2014
  • STATUS REPORT (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY CONSERVATOR NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • FILING OF STATUS REPORT, CALENDAR OF JUL-02-2014, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR COMPLIANCE STATUS HEARING, CALENDAR OF SEP-04-2013, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • NOTICE OF CONSERVATEE'S RIGHTS FILED BY CONSERVATOR NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • GENERAL PLAN (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY CONSERVATOR NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • AMENDED DETERMINATION OF CONSERVATEE'S APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FILED BY CONSERVATOR NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR COMPLIANCE STATUS HEARING CONTINUED FROM AUG-21-2013 TO SEP-04-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR COMPLIANCE STATUS HEARING CONTINUED FROM AUG-07-2013 TO AUG-21-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • DETERMINATION OF CONSERVATEE'S APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FILED BY CONSERVATOR NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • PROOF OF COMPLETION OF TRAINING FILED BY CONSERVATOR NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2013
  • AMENDED PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONS. OF THE PERSON FILED BY PETITIONER NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF CONSERVATEE'S RIGHTS FILED BY PETITIONER NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • CITATION FILED BY PETITIONER NELSON, DOUGLAS AS TO CONSERVATEE NELSON, JOHN PREWITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • SCREENING FORM (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR FILED BY PETITIONER NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • CAPACITY DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • CONTACT INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER NELSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF PERSON, CITATION ISSUED, FILED BY PETITIONER NELSON, DOUGLAS AS TO CONSERVATEE NELSON, JOHN PREWITT HEARING SET FOR MAR-28-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less