Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2016 at 19:31:27 (UTC).

CONSERVATORSHIP OF FRED SCHENKEL

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 CONSERVATORSHIP OF FRED SCHENKEL was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6449

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservator

SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

SCHENKEL, FRED AKA FREDERICK GEORGE SCHENKEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservator Attorney

GRATZ, SALLY PRICE

Attorney at SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

1650 Mission Street, 4Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

Conservatee Attorney

KATO, BRENT RICHARD

Attorney at KATO, FEDER & SUZUKI

685 Market Street, Suite 540

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2015
  • ORDER TERMINATING CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON, FINAL ACCOUNTING #1 FILED BY CONSERVATOR SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, CALENDAR OF AUG-17-2015, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY CONSERVATOR SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS OF PETITION TO TERMINATE CONSERVATORSHIP DUE TO THE DEATH OF THE CONSERVATEE ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, CALENDAR OF JUL-13-2015, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • PROOF OF PAYMENT OF ASSESSMENT FEES FILED BY CONSERVATOR SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN (Fee:800.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES FILED BY CONSERVATOR SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN HEARING SET FOR AUG-17-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS OF PETITION TO TERMINATE CONSERVATORSHIP DUE TO THE DEATH OF THE CONSERVATEE ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING HEARING SET FOR JUL-13-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • ORDER TO CLOSE CONSERVATORSHIP - WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • DEATH OF CONSERVATEE (MAR-05-2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • PROOF OF PAYMENT OF ASSESSMENT FEES FILED BY CONSERVATOR SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN (Fee:800.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2013
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • CITATION FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN AS TO CONSERVATEE SCHENKEL, FRED AKA FREDERICK GEORGE SCHENKEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • NOTICE OF HEARING [2] FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • CONTACT INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • CAPACITY DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DECLARATION OF ATTENDING PHYSICIAN FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF PERS/ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN HEARING SET FOR FEB-13-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE, CITATION ISSUED, FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN AS TO CONSERVATEE SCHENKEL, FRED AKA FREDERICK GEORGE SCHENKEL HEARING SET FOR APR-04-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less