This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2016 at 19:31:17 (UTC).

CONSERVATORSHIP OF DAVID ALBRIGHT

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 CONSERVATORSHIP OF DAVID ALBRIGHT was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6447

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservator

SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

ALBRIGHT, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservator Attorney

BLACKMAN, JOEL MARTIN

Attorney at SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

1650 Mission Street, 4Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2015
  • PAYMENT OF EXEMPT FEES (FEB-01-2013 PETN FOR APPNTMNT CNSRVTR/GRDN ESTATE/PRSN OR OPP) PAID BY CONSERVATOR SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • PAYMENT OF EXEMPT FEES (MAY-29-2014 PROBATE MOTION) PAID BY CONSERVATOR SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • PAYMENT OF EXEMPT FEES (MAR-28-2013 CERTIFIED/EXEMPLIFIED COPIES) PAID BY CONSERVATOR SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN (Fee:159.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • REVIEW INVESTIGATION REPORT (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • ASSESSMENT AND ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • STATUS REPORT (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY CONSERVATOR SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • FILING OF FIRST ACCOUNT, CALENDAR OF JUN-18-2014, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • REQUEST AND ORDER TO WAIVE ACCOUNTINGS FILED BY CONSERVATOR SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • REQUEST AND ORDER TO DEFER ASSESSMENT FEES FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR COMPLIANCE STATUS HEARING, CALENDAR OF AUG-28-2013, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2013
  • COPYING FEES (18 PAGE, 6 CERTIFIED COPY) (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-28-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • INITIAL INVESTIGATION REPORT (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • CITATION FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN AS TO CONSERVATEE ALBRIGHT, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • CONTACT INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • DECLARATION OF ATTENDING PHYSICIAN RE: CONSERVATEE'S ABILITY TO RETURN TO AND CONTROL RESIDENCE OF DR. LISA HOO, MD. (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • CAPACITY DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE, CITATION ISSUED, FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN AS TO CONSERVATEE ALBRIGHT, DAVID HEARING SET FOR MAR-28-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less