This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/27/2016 at 03:07:20 (UTC).

CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON

Case Summary

On 08/09/2013 CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E STEVENSON was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7002

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Conservators

SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

BIBBS, PAULA R.

WILLIAMS, NOEMESHA

STEVENSON, CHARLES E. CHARLES STEVENSON, AKA C. EVERETT STEVENSON

Conservatee and Petitioner

STEVENSON, CHARLES E. CHARLES STEVENSON, AKA C. EVERETT STEVENSON

Others

PHILADELPHIA INSURANCE COMPANIES

WILLIAMS, ANTHONY R.

ALLSTATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 94212

Palatine, IL 60094-4212

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservator Attorneys

BLACKMAN, JOEL MARTIN

Attorney at SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

1650 Mission Street, 4Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

NAVIA, ROWENA C

Attorney at KATO, FEDER & SUZUKI, LLP

685 Market Street, #540

San Francisco, CA 94105-4205

GOFF, STANLEY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STANLEY GOFF

15 Boardman Place Suite 2

San Francisco, CA 94103

CALLEJO, GENEVIEVE FRANCHESCA

220 Bush Street, Mills Tower, Suite 1650

San Francisco, CA 94104

Petitioner and Conservatee Attorney

CALLEJO, GENEVIEVE FRANCHESCA

220 Bush Street, Mills Tower, Suite 1650

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorney

MAH, DONALD

609 Jefferson Street, Suite C

Fairfield, CA 94533

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF TAKING POSSESSION OR CONTROL OF AN ASSET OF MINOR OR CONSERVATEE FILED BY OTHER ALLSTATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES FILED BY CONSERVATOR BIBBS, PAULA R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, CALENDAR OF JUN-09-2015, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER BOND IS REDUCED BY $34,000.00 TO $196,000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • ORIGINAL BANK STMTS. IN SUPPORT OF FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CONSERVATOR. (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY CONSERVATOR BIBBS, PAULA R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • STATUS REPORT (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY CONSERVATOR WILLIAMS, NOEMESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES CONTINUED FROM MAY-26-2015 TO JUN-09-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • ORIGINAL BANK STMTS, IN SUPPROT OF FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CONSERVATOR (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY CONSERVATOR BIBBS, PAULA R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES CONTINUED FROM MAY-12-2015 TO MAY-26-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CONSERVATOR AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT, FOR APPROVAL FOR ITS SETTLEMENT, ETC. FILED BY CONSERVATOR BIBBS, PAULA R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES CONTINUED FROM APR-28-2015 TO MAY-12-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2013
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF PERS/ESTATE CONTINUED TO SEP-10-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • CITATION FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN AS TO CONSERVATEE STEVENSON, CHARLES E. CHARLES STEVENSON, AKA C. EVERETT STEVENSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • PROBATE OPPOSITION/OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF PERS/ESTATE FILED BY OBJECTOR WILLIAMS, ANTHONY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • CONTACT INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF PERS/ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN HEARING SET FOR AUG-23-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE, CITATION ISSUED, FILED BY PETITIONER SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN AS TO CONSERVATEE STEVENSON, CHARLES E. CHARLES STEVENSON, AKA C. EVERETT STEVENSON HEARING SET FOR OCT-24-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:FEB-18-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Temporary Conservator'S Final Account
Rulings:off calendar


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:SEP-18-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Rulings: Grant without hearing (despite missing file).


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:AUG-08-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES
Rulings: Continued to 8/27/18 at Counsel's request.


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:JUL-11-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES
Rulings: Continued to 8/8/18. Notes sent.


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:JUN-27-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES
Rulings: Continued to 7/11/18. The amended petition and confidential file (original statements) were not delivered to the reviewing Examiner as of 6/25/18.It appears that a Prob. C. Section 13100 affidavit may be necessary to transfer the remaining assets.


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:JUN-13-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 6/27/18. Amended accounting petition filed just before the hearing. No proposed order. No proof of service (of either the original petition or of the amended petition).


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:MAY-08-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Of Petition To Terminate Conservatorship And Of The Final Accounting Due To The Death Of The Conservatee
Rulings:off calendar


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:APR-10-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Of Petition To Terminate Conservatorship And Of The Final Accounting Due To The Death Of The Conservatee
Rulings:continued to may 8, 2018 to trail the petition in the related trust proceeding.


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:FEB-13-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Of Petition To Terminate Conservatorship And Of The Final Accounting Due To The Death Of The Conservatee
Rulings:Continued to 4/10/18


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:AUG-21-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Rulings: Continued to 9/18/17 at Counsel's request.


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:APR-28-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 5/12/15 - Notes faxed 4/24/15


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:JUL-24-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Rulings: Continued to 8/21/17. Notes sent.


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:JUN-20-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Hearing On The Filing Of The Second Account/Report
Rulings: OFF CALENDAR


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:JUN-06-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Hearing On The Filing Of The Second Account/Report
Rulings: Hearing. Appearance required.


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:MAY-09-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Hearing On The Filing Of The Second Account/Report
Rulings: Continued to 6/6/17 at Counsel's request.


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:JUN-09-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Grant without hearing


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:MAY-26-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 6/9/15 - Notes faxed 5/21/15


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:MAY-12-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 5/26/15 - Notes faxed 5/8/15


Case Number:*******7002
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHARLES E. STEVENSON
Court Date:AUG-27-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES
Rulings: Grant without hearing


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN FRANCISCO PUBLIC GUARDIAN (CONSERVATOR, OBJECTOR, PETITIONER FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #287694) is a litigant

Latest cases where Philadelphia Insurance Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLSTATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALLEJO, G. FRANCHESCA