This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/25/2016 at 04:02:24 (UTC).

CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY

Case Summary

On 12/20/2010 CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4148

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Conservators, Petitioners and Others

LUCAS, THOMAS A.

SMALLEY, BEATRICE

Others and Conservators

DOLCH, DEBRA J

DANA, PATRICK R.

San Bruno, CA 94066

SMALLEY, BEATRICE

PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

350 Sansome Street, Ste. 1000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other, Conservator and Petitioner Attorneys

CANNY, PAULA KAY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PAULA CANNY

840 Hinckley Road, Suite 101

Burlingame, CA 94010

FUNG, ELIZABETH PUIYEE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CINDY LEE

14 Precita Ave.

San Francisco, CA 94110

TOMIOKA, GRANT T.

1731 Buchanan Street

San Francisco, CA 94115

ZEPEDA, ANDREW W

Attorney at THE ALVAREZ FIRMS

24005 Ventura Blvd

Calabasas, CA 91302

WENZEL, HELENE V.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HELENE V. WENZEL

2000 Van Ness Avenue, Suite 516

San Francisco, CA 94109

EPSTEIN, BETTE BEECHEN

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

DANA, PATRICK RAMON

1220 Crystal Spring Avenue

San Bruno, CA 94066

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2014
  • PETITION FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, CALENDAR OF MAR-11-2014, OFF CALENDAR - SEE MINI-MINUTES FOR THIS DATE - PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-11-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER SMALLEY, BEATRICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • PETITION FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CONSERVATOR SMALLEY, BEATRICE HEARING SET FOR MAR-11-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:435.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY CONSERVATOR LUCAS, THOMAS A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT FILED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FEES, CALENDAR OF AUG-13-2012, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FEES, CALENDAR OF AUG-13-2012, TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF AUG-13-2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-13-2012 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • EX PARTE HEARING ON TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP REQUESTED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A. HEARING SET FOR DEC-30-2010 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • NOTICE OF HEARING [TEMPORARY] FILED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF PERS/ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A. (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • SCREENING FORM (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • CONTACT INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR FILED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE, CITATION ISSUED, FILED BY PETITIONER LUCAS, THOMAS A. AS TO CONSERVATEE SMALLEY, BEATRICE HEARING SET FOR FEB-17-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4148
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY
Court Date:MAR-11-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition For Payment Of Attorney'S Fees And Costs
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******4148
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY
Court Date:AUG-13-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******4148
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY
Court Date:JUL-11-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition For Attorney Compensation And For Discharge
Rulings:Grant without hearing


Case Number:*******4148
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY
Court Date:JUN-20-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:Petition For Attorney Compensation And For Discharge
Rulings:Continued to 7/11/12 - No order


Case Number:*******4148
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY
Court Date:APR-23-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On The Filing Of The Final Account By Tom Lucas
Rulings:Off calendar


Case Number:*******4148
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY
Court Date:APR-02-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On The Filing Of The Final Account By Tom Lucas
Rulings:Status hearing on filing final account by Thomas Lucas, continued to 4/23/12, if not on file at that time, an appearance will be required


Case Number:*******4148
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY
Court Date:FEB-29-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On The Filing Of The Final Account By Tom Lucas
Rulings:Continued to 4/2/12


Case Number:*******4148
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY
Court Date:FEB-01-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On The Filing Of The Final Account By Tom Lucas
Rulings:Continued to 2/29/12


Case Number:*******4148
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY
Court Date:DEC-28-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On The Filing Of The Final Account By Tom Lucas
Rulings:Hearing


Case Number:*******4148
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY
Court Date:NOV-28-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On The Filing Of The Final Account By Tom Lucas
Rulings:Continued to 12/28/11


Case Number:*******4148
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF BEATRICE SMALLEY
Court Date:AUG-04-2011 10:30 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE
Rulings:


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOMIOKA, GRANT T.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEPEDA ANDREW WILLIAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Canny, Paula K.