This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/02/2018 at 15:15:39 (UTC).

CONSERVATORSHIP OF AMINAH HAM

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 CONSERVATORSHIP OF AMINAH HAM was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K. STEWART. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1514

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K. STEWART

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MACH, SARIDA T.

MACH, TI

HAM, SON

Conservatee

HAM, AMINAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EMMONS, MELANIE

Attorney at KATO FEDER & SUZUKI, LLP

685 Market Street, Suite 540

San Francisco, CA 94105

Conservatee Attorney

SOOD, VICTORIA TRAN

2225 E. Bayshore Road, St 200

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • Payment : PETN FOR APPNTMNT CNSRVTR/GRDN ESTATE/PRSN OR OPP; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : R5218104P006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PETITIONER MACH, TI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PETITIONER MACH, SARIDA T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PETITIONER HAM, SON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER HAM, SON MACH, SARIDA T. MACH, TI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • REQUEST PENDING TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER MACH, TI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • REQUEST PENDING TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER MACH, SARIDA T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR FILED BY PETITIONER HAM, SON MACH, SARIDA T. MACH, TI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • SCREENING FORM (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER HAM, SON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • SCREENING FORM (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER MACH, TI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • SCREENING FORM (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER MACH, SARIDA T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • CONTACT INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER HAM, SON MACH, SARIDA T. MACH, TI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER HAM, SON MACH, SARIDA T. MACH, TI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • CAPACITY DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER HAM, SON MACH, SARIDA T. MACH, TI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • REQUEST PENDING TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER HAM, SON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LIMITED CONSERVATOR OF PERSON, CITATION ISSUED, FILED BY PETITIONER HAM, SON MACH, SARIDA T. MACH, TI AS TO CONSERVATEE HAM, AMINAH HEARING SET FOR MAR-01-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******1514
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF AMINAH HAM
Court Date:JUN-13-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Compliance Status Hearing
Rulings:off calendar.


Case Number:*******1514
Case Title:CONSERVATORSHIP OF AMINAH HAM
Court Date:MAY-08-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:FILING OF STATUS REPORT
Rulings:Off calendar


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victoria T. Sood