This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/24/2016 at 05:13:32 (UTC).

CONNIE SOWELS VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2009 CONNIE SOWELS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5312

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOWELS, CONNIE

Defendants

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I, J, N

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

MARINE ENGINEERING AND SUPPLY COMPANY

WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

BIGGE CRANE AND RIGGING CO.

AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYGIENISTS, INC.

FORCEE MANUFACTURING CORPORATION

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC. AND NOT THE CLAIMS AGAINST THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY

J. T. THORPE & SON, INC.

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY

HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

KIRTLAND ENTERPRISE GROUP, INC.

VIACOM AND NOT THE CLAIMS AGAINST CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC. FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION)

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

62 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Defendant Attorneys

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

KRAFT, ROBERT S

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Other Attorneys

MARTENS, DANIEL L.

SHELDON, CHARLES T

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

YARON, GEORGE DIMITRI

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

MROZ, SCOTT DAVID

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

KELLY, DANIEL J.

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

GAMBA, PAUL JOSEPH

LOVE, MARK A

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

EXHIBITS D AND E TO THE DECLARATION OF PAUL J. GAMBA IN SUPPORT OF LAMONS GASKET COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BIFURCATE THE TRIAL ON THE ISSUE OF SUCCESSOR LIABILITY, OR ALTERNATIVELY REQUESTING A HEARING UNDER CALIFORNIA EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 402 TO

EXHIBITS D AND E TO THE DECLARATION OF PAUL J. GAMBA IN SUPPORT OF LAMONS GASKET COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BIFURCATE THE TRIAL ON THE ISSUE OF SUCCESSOR LIABILITY, OR ALTERNATIVELY REQUESTING A HEARING UNDER CALIFORNIA EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 402 TO DETERMINE THAT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY IS NOT LIABLE FOR FLEXITALLIC GASKETS DISTRIBUTED BY POWER ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT CO., INC. - PART 3 OF 3 - MOT (TRANSACTION ID # 42396946) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE / OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 32671780) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS' TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 & 2

Defendant S.T.M Automotives Motion In Limine No. 11

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 (TRANSACTION ID # 42619533) FILED BY DEFENDANT S.T.M. AUTOMOTIVE

MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT, ALLAN SMITH - Motion in Limine No. 38

MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT, ALLAN SMITH - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 38 (TRANSACTION ID # 42396946) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL ?ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 27985345) FILED BY DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

ORDER

ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF MARINE ENGINEERING AND SUPPLY COMPANY, BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 27936742) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

Northrop Grumman Shipbuildings Objection to Assignment to Commissioner for Trial

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 27752310) FILED BY DEFENDANT HUNTINGTON INGALLS INCORPORATED

236 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-03-2015. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-03-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, KIMBERLY CHU. E-FILING OF THE DISMISSAL IS PENDING. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57654436)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56969679) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT MARINE ENGINEERING AND SUPPLY COMPANY SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • DocketUNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF DEC-18-2014, APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MARINE ENGINEERING AND SUPPLY COMPANY GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: MITCH LYON , CSR#6840. (514)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR DEC-18-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 514

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DocketUNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2014 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MARINE ENGINEERING AND SUPPLY COMPANY CONTINUED TO DEC-18-2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 514, AT THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. (514)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, BRENDA POSADA. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
260 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27910437) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27910437) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27914606) FILED BY DEFENDANT TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27914606) FILED BY DEFENDANT TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 27752310) FILED BY DEFENDANT HUNTINGTON INGALLS INCORPORATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27752310) FILED BY DEFENDANT HUNTINGTON INGALLS INCORPORATED (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27575439) FILED BY DEFENDANT BIGGE CRANE AND RIGGING CO. (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOWELS, CONNIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOWELS, CONNIE AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I, J, N DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-19-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5312
Case Title:CONNIE SOWELS VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al
Court Date:FEB-01-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, February 1, 2012 in Department 503 at 9:30 a.m., Line 1. Defendant Todd Shipyards Corp.u00BFs motion for summary judgment is granted. Defendant sustained its burden of production and plaintiff failed to present evidence creating a triable issue whether he was exposed to an asbestos-containing product or material attributable to defendant. Defendantu00BFs objections to plaintiffu00BFs declaration are overruled. Defendantu00BFs objections to Mr. Ayu00BFs declaration are sustained. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:45am. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If a court reporter is needed, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/TLJ)



Case Number:*******5312
Case Title:CONNIE SOWELS VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al
Court Date:JAN-19-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings: ON ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR FOR THURSDAY, JANUARY 19, 2012 IN DEPARTMENT 503 AT 9:30 A.M., LINE 3, Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporationu00BFs motion for summary judgment is continued on the courtu00BFs own motion to February 1, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. in Department 503. = (503/TLJ)