This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 17:41:16 (UTC).

COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA VS. EVEAN PERKINS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EVEAN PERKINS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4176

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION

Defendants

PERKINS, EVEAN

San Francisco, CA 94109

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSSOFF, MICHAEL SHERWOOD

One United Nations Plaza

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY RE: LOSS OF ORIGINAL LEASE BY MICHAEL ROSSOFF, ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF. FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION

Notice to Defendants

NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

CLERKS JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER - POSSESSION ONLY

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN DOES 1 TO 10 THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 684 ELLIS STREET, #608, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA 94109, **JUDGMENT APPLIES TO ALL UNKNOWN/UNNAMED OCCUPANTS.**

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $.83 FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED UNSATISFIED; SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION SERVED FEB-28-2013, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION SERVED FEB-28-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

EX PARTE APPLIC FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION (Fee:20.00)

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN DOES 1 TO 10

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN

ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS

ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION SERVED FEB-28-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED UNSATISFIED; SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $.83 FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN DOES 1 TO 10 THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 684 ELLIS STREET, #608, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA 94109, **JUDGMENT APPLIES TO ALL UNKNOWN/UNNAMED OCCUPANTS.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY RE: LOSS OF ORIGINAL LEASE BY MICHAEL ROSSOFF, ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF. FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION SERVED FEB-28-2013, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION SERVED FEB-28-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION SERVED FEB-28-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT PERKINS, EVEAN DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less