This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:47:13 (UTC).

COMERICA BANK VS. INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 COMERICA BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8439

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMERICA BANK

Defendants

AHUMADA, ANGEL

INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 100, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COX, PAMELA L.

Attorney at HEMAR RUSSO & HEALD LLP

15910 Ventura Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Encino, CA 91436-2829

 

Court Documents

AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT,

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $15,011.15 INTEREST, $212.95 COSTS, **AMENDED** M/D OF 1/2/15 (TRANSACTION ID # 14351057) FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 100, INCL.

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-28-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-03-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-28-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgement, Acknowledgement of Credit, and De

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $18,962.62 INTEREST, $212.95 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 14350006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING AMENDED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL $71,109.50 PRINCIPAL, $13,275.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $56,131.94 INTEREST, $804.85 COSTS, $5,570.66 ($5570.66 LATE CHARGES ), TOTAL JUDGMENT $146,891.95, SEE SCANNED DOC

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NTC OF DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARINGS, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK HEARING SET FOR JUL-16-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:60.00)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, COST BILL $804.85 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL

DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL $71,109.50 PRINCIPAL, $56,131.94 INTEREST, $804.85 COSTS, $5,570.66 LATE CHARGES, TOTAL JUDGMENT $133,616.95, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 HOURS

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $2.50 AS TO DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL

NOTICE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK

COMPLAINT

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK AS TO DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL DOES 1 TO 100, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

ORDER

ORDER ALLOWING WAIVER OF PLAINTIFF'S APPEARANCE AT PROVE-UP HEARING

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK SERVED MAR-17-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE PARTY PREVAILING ON CONTRACT AND TO FIX AMOUNT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AWARDABLE AS ITEMOF COSTS AT $13,275 (GRANTED)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $2.50 AS TO DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $15,011.15 INTEREST, $212.95 COSTS, **AMENDED** M/D OF 1/2/15 (TRANSACTION ID # 14351057) FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $18,962.62 INTEREST, $212.95 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 14350006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION DEC-10-2013 DISCHARGED, NO APPEARANCES. NO PROOF OF SERVICE. JUDGE: DONALD J. SULLIVAN. CLERK: S. VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING AMENDED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL $71,109.50 PRINCIPAL, $13,275.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $56,131.94 INTEREST, $804.85 COSTS, $5,570.66 ($5570.66 LATE CHARGES ), TOTAL JUDGMENT $146,891.95, SEE SCANNED DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE PARTY PREVAILING ON CONTRACT AND TO FIX AMOUNT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AWARDABLE AS ITEMOF COSTS AT $13,275 (GRANTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-25-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK'S MOTION TO DETERMINE PARTY PREVAILING ON CONTRACT AND TO FIX AMOUNT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AWARDABLE AS ITEM AS COSTS AT $13,275.00 IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; COURT REPORTER: ANTHONY C. VAUGHN, CSR # 6185 (302)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NTC OF DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARINGS, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK HEARING SET FOR JUL-16-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $804.85 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE JUN-19-2013, FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK AS TO DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK SERVED MAR-17-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AHUMADA, ANGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK SERVED MAR-17-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COMERICA BANK AS TO DEFENDANT INTEGRITY RECRUITING INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AHUMADA, ANGEL DOES 1 TO 100, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less