This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 13:05:00 (UTC).

CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP VS. PREMO MEDIA, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/30/2017 CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PREMO MEDIA, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, HAROLD E. KAHN, RICHARD B. ULMER, ERIC R. FLEMING, GAIL DEKREON, RONALD E. QUIDACHAY and CURTIS KARNOW. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6736

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

HAROLD E. KAHN

RICHARD B. ULMER

ERIC R. FLEMING

GAIL DEKREON

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

CURTIS KARNOW

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

GRANT JR., CARY AN INDIVIDUAL

PREMO MEDIA, INC.

GRANT, CAREY

San Francisco, CA 94105

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEYER, ALLAN

Attorney at STEYER, LOWENTHAL, BOODROOKAS, ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

One California St., Third Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

WHITE, ROBERT EDWARD

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. WHITE

177 Post Street, Suite 550

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorney

LLEWELLYN, PAUL T.

Attorney at LEWIS & LLEWELLYN LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING AMENDED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PREMO MEDIA, INC. GRANT JR., CARY AN INDIVIDUAL $250,000.00 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $250,000.00, SEE SCANNED JUDGMENT

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF (1) ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMEN

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT AND AMENDED JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62652366) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES OF HEARING ON EX PARTE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62597255) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP

Declaration Of Robert E. White In Support Of Ex Parte Motion To Amend

DECLARATION OF ROBERT E. WHITE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62590584) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP

Declaration Of Jill K. Cohoe In Support Of Ex Parte Motion To Amend Ju

DECLARATION OF JILL K. COHOE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62590584) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP

Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte Motion To

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62590584) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP

Ex Parte Motion to Amend Judgment

EX PARTE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62590584) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP

Notice of Entry of Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62062313) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDERS OF EXAMINATION BY AGREEMENT OF THE PAR

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDERS OF EXAMINATION BY AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES (TRANSACTION ID # 63365516) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP

Failure to Appear for Order of Examination

ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO PREMO MEDIA, INC., BY CARY GRANT, JR., ITS CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER, ON MAR-05-2019 - CONTINUED TO MAY-07-2019 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 514 FOR LETTER PURSUANT TO THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES AND COUNSEL, AND AT THE WRITTEN REQUEST OF ROBET E. WHITE, ESQ., COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP, ON 3/4/19. BENCH LETTER REISSUED. NO FURTHER NOTICE REQUIRED. THE PARTIES AND COUNSEL WAIVE NOTICE OF THE 5/7/19 EXAMINATION DATE. NO APPEARANCE. NOT REPORTED. JUDGE: SUZANNE BOLANOS. CLERK: K. DOUGHERTY. (D514).

Failure to Appear for Order of Examination

ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT CAREY GRANT, JR. MAR-05-2019 - CONTINUED TO MAY-07-2019 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 514 FOR LETTER PURSUANT TO THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES AND COUNSEL, AND AT THE WRITTEN REQUEST OF ROBET E. WHITE, ESQ., COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP, ON 3/4/19. BENCH LETTER REISSUED. NO FURTHER NOTICE REQUIRED. THE PARTIES AND COUNSEL WAIVE NOTICE OF THE 5/7/19 EXAMINATION DATE. NO APPEARANCE. NOT REPORTED. JUDGE: SUZANNE BOLANOS. CLERK: K. DOUGHERTY. (D514).

Failure to Appear for Order of Examination

ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT PREMO MEDIA, INC. ON FEB-05-2019 - CONTINUED TO MAR-05-2019 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 514 FOR LETTER PURSUANT TO THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES, AND AT THE WRITTEN REQUEST OF ROBERT E. WHITE, ESQ., COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF/CREDITOR CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP. DATED 2/4/19. NO APPEARANCE. NOT REPORTED. (D514).

Failure to Appear for Order of Examination

ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT CAREY GRANT, JR. ON FEB-05-2019 - CONTINUED TO MAR-05-2019 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 514 FOR LETTER PURSUANT TO THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES, AND AT THE WRITTEN REQUEST OF ROBERT E. WHITE, ESQ., COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF/CREDITOR CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP. DATED 2/4/19. NO APPEARANCE. NOT REPORTED. (D514).

Failure to Appear for Order of Examination

ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO PREMO MEDIA, INC., BY CARY GRANT, JR., ITS CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER, ON DEC-19-2018 - CONTINUED TO FEB-05-2019 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 514 FOR LETTER. ROBERT E. WHITE, ESQ. APPEARED FOR PLAINTIFF/CREDITOR CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT/DEBTOR PREMO MEDIA, INC., BY CARY GRANT, JR., ITS CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER. PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/08/18. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. JUDGE: ERIC R. FLEMING. CLERK: K. DOUGHERTY. (D514).

Failure to Appear for Order of Examination

ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT CARY GRANT, JR. ON DEC-19-2018 - CONTINUED TO FEB-05-2019 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 514 FOR LETTER. ROBERT E. WHITE, ESQ. APPEARED FOR PLAINTIFF/CREDITOR CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGAMENT, LP. NO APPEARANCE BY CARY GRANT, JR. PROOF OF SERVICE OF OEX ON FILE. PERSONALLY SERVED ON 11/08/18. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. JUDGE: ERIC R. FLEMING. CLERK: K. DOUGHERTY. (D514)

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - CIVIL

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OR APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION (TRANSACTION ID # 62652366) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - CIVIL

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FOR APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION (TRANSACTION ID # 62652366) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketPayment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B7119812S013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketPayment : ORDER OF EXAMINATION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R4918A26O010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketPayment : ORDER OF EXAMINATION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R4918A26O009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketPayment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4918A23E012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5218523M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketPayment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1718405E007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1418117M006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1418117M005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketPayment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4917C28R008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4917C28M007

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND ALLOW THE ANSWER TO BE FILED BY DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketFEE PAID FOR STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND ALLOW THE ANSWER TO BE FILED BY DEFENDANTS (TRANSACTION ID # 100020463) FILED BY DEFENDANT PREMO MEDIA, INC. GRANT, CAREY (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-16-2017 CONTINUED TO DEC-20-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 60787638) AS TO DEFENDANT GRANT JR., CARY AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 60787638) AS TO DEFENDANT PREMO MEDIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-05-2017 CONTINUED TO AUG-16-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60663601), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP SERVED MAY-08-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAY-08-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT PREMO MEDIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60648845), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP SERVED MAY-08-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAY-08-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT GRANT JR., CARY AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP AS TO DEFENDANT PREMO MEDIA, INC. GRANT JR., CARY AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-05-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-03-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-12-2017 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6736
Case Title:CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP VS. PREMO MEDIA, INC. ET AL
Court Date:MAR-16-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Status Hearing Re: Defendant Legal Representation
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Friday, March 16, 2018, Line 4. Status Hearing Re: Defendant Legal Representation. OFF CALENDAR. Notice of Settlement on file. =(501/REQ)


Case Number:*******6736
Case Title:CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP VS. PREMO MEDIA, INC. ET AL
Court Date:FEB-22-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Defendant Premo Media, Inc.S Responses To Plaintiffs Requests For Production Of Documents And Form Interrogatories, To Deem Requests For Admission Admitted, And For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday February 22, 2016, line 2.PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Defendant Premo Media, Inc.S Responses To Plaintiffs Requests For Production Of Documents And Form Interrogatories, To Deem Requests For Admission Admitted, And For Monetary SanctionsGRANTED. Admissions are deemed admitted. Complete verified responses without objections to Request for Production and Form Interrogatories be provided within 10 days of notice of entry of order. Sanctions granted in the amount of $1,360. No opposition filed. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******6736
Case Title:CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP VS. PREMO MEDIA, INC. ET AL
Court Date:FEB-16-2018 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Defendant Premo Media, Inc.S Responses To Plaintiffs Requests For Production Of Documents And Form Interrogatories, To Deem Requests For Admission Admitted, And For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Set for hearing on Friday, February 16, 2018, Line 5, PLAINTIFF CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP's Motion To Compel Defendant Premo Media, Inc.'s Responses To Plaintiff's Requests For Production Of Documents And Form Interrogatories, To Deem Requests For Admission Admitted, And For Monetary Sanctions.Pro Tem Judge Noah Lebowitz, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Parties to appear.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to noah@dplolaw.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =(302/JPT/RBU)


Case Number:*******6736
Case Title:CLEARPOINT INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LP VS. PREMO MEDIA, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JAN-30-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Lewis & Llewellyn Llp'S Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel For Premo Media, Inc.
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, January 30, 2018, Line 7. Lewis & Llewellyn LLP'S Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel For Premo Media, Inc.GRANTED. Status Report Re: New Counsel for Premo Media Inc. is set for February 22, 2018. If new counsel is obtained prior to the hearing, it will be ordered off calendar. This matter is calendared for judicial mediation on March 1, 2018. =(501/REQ)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LLEWELLYN, PAUL T.