This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 20:06:58 (UTC).

CLARICE LACAU VS. RACHEL CORNELL et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2013 CLARICE LACAU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RACHEL CORNELL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3388

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LACAU, CLARICE

LACAU, CLARICE , TRUSTEE OF THE CLARICE LACAU REVOCABLE TRUST

Defendants

CORNELL, RACHEL

DOES 1 TO 100, INCL.

MISSION NATIONAL BANK

CORNELL, RACHEL , TRUSTEE OF THE RACHEL CORNELL REVOCABLE TRUST SEPTEMBER 2. 1999

CORNELL, RACHAEL (RICCI) , ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS RACHEL CORNELL

ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS CLAIMING ANY INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY

Other

STYER, CHRISTY J. (COURT APPOINTED PARTITION REFEREE)

San Francisco, CA 94104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

POLLAK, STEVEN LAYNE

DUNN, RYAN T.

SCOTT, MICHELE L.

Attorney at ZACKS & FREEDMAN, P.C.

235 Montgomery Street, Ste 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ZACKS, ANDREW MAYER

Attorney at ZACKS & FREEDMAN, P.C.

235 Montgomery St Ste 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

CROSS, ROBERT REEVES

Attorney at DONAHUE FITZGERALD LLP

1999 Harrison Street, 25Th Fl

Oakland, CA 94612-3520

RUBINSTEIN, YANO

Attorney at RUBINSTEIN LAW

660 4Th St. #302

San Francisco, CA 94107

 

Court Documents

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR JUL-14-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-08-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL

MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHAEL (RICCI) , ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS RACHEL CORNELL HEARING SET FOR JUN-26-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:60.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL AND/OR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHAEL (RICCI) , ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS RACHEL CORNELL

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S MTN TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MISSION NATIONAL BANK

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED INCORRECTLY AS CORNELL, RACHEL TO BE CORNELL, RACHEL , TRUSTEE OF THE RACHEL CORNELL REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 2. 1999

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: STIPULATED INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT OF PARTITION BY SALE AND APPOINTMENT OF REFEREE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

Declaration of phillip seltzer in support of response to referees peti

DECLARATION OF PHILLIP SELTZER IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO REFEREES PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 100006061) FILED BY DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHEL , TRUSTEE OF THE RACHEL CORNELL REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 2. 1999

Declaration of Michele L. Scott ISO Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application fo

DECLARATION OF MICHELE L. SCOTT ISO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO RE-SET CASE FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58124638) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LACAU, CLARICE

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-31-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER

ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL (FROM 6/09/12 TO 6/02/14; OPPOS: 5/22; REPLY; 5/27)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL AND/OR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHAEL (RICCI) , ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS RACHEL CORNELL

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15056167) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LACAU, CLARICE

Exhibit H to Referees Return and Report of Sale of Real Property By Pr

EXHIBIT H TO REFEREES RETURN AND REPORT OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY BY PRIVATE SALE (PART 5 OF 5) (TRANSACTION ID # 57407010) FILED BY OTHER STYER, CHRISTY J. (COURT APPOINTED PARTITION REFEREE)

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF CLARICE LACAU IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOT

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF CLARICE LACAU IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE OF REAL PROPERTY (TRANSACTION ID # 100001192) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LACAU, CLARICE

Response to referees petition for instructions

RESPONSE TO REFEREES PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 100006061) FILED BY DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHEL , TRUSTEE OF THE RACHEL CORNELL REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 2. 1999

Notice of Joinder of Plaintiff in Partition Referees Petition for Inst

NOTICE OF JOINDER IN PARTITION REFEREES PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 57938788) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LACAU, CLARICE , TRUSTEE OF THE CLARICE LACAU REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 28, 1999 HEARING SET FOR OCT-13-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Partition Referees Petition f

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PARTITION REFEREE'S PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 57938788) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LACAU, CLARICE , TRUSTEE OF THE CLARICE LACAU REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 28, 1999

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-31-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100009423) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHAEL (RICCI) , ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS RACHEL CORNELL (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • OBJECTION HEARING OF NOV-25-2015 HELD. JUDGE JOHN K. STEWART; CLERK: MOLOPERNES. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (610)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR OBJECTION HEARING HEARING SET FOR NOV-25-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100009150) FILED BY DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHEL , TRUSTEE OF THE RACHEL CORNELL REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 2. 1999

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR MAY-31-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOV-25-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100008495) FILED BY DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHAEL (RICCI) , ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS RACHEL CORNELL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE; (TRANSACTION ID # 58146640) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LACAU, CLARICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58146640) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LACAU, CLARICE ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JEFF JUROW ISO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO RE-SET CASE FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58124638) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LACAU, CLARICE

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2014
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHAEL (RICCI) , ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS RACHEL CORNELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • O QUASH OF MODIFY DEPO SUBPOENA FILED BY DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHAEL (RICCI) , ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS RACHEL CORNELL HEARING SET FOR APR-21-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MISSION NATIONAL BANK ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR JUL-14-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-08-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: DUNN, RYAN T. SUBSTITUTED FOR POLLAK, STEVEN LAYNE AS ATTORNEY FOR LACAU, CLARICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHAEL (RICCI) , ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS RACHEL CORNELL (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MISSION NATIONAL BANK (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LACAU, CLARICE SERVED AUG-21-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MISSION NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LACAU, CLARICE AS TO DEFENDANT CORNELL, RACHEL , TRUSTEE OF THE RACHEL CORNELL REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 2. 1999 MISSION NATIONAL BANK ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS CLAIMING ANY INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DOES 1 TO 100, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-08-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-07-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-24-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less