Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:52:49 (UTC).

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TAX COLLECTOR VS. FERNANDO MARTINS

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TAX COLLECTOR filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against FERNANDO MARTINS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3078

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TAX COLLECTOR

1 Dr. Carlton B.Goodlett Pl

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant

MARTINS, FERNANDO

Pacifica, CA 94044

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 85.50 - SERVED FEB-10-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MARTINS, FERNANDO

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TAX COLLECTOR RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MARTINS, FERNANDO $5,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $85.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,085.50 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $5,000.00 FILED BY CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TAX COLLECTOR AS TO DEFENDANT MARTINS, FERNANDO ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-11-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:EXEMPT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TAX COLLECTOR RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MARTINS, FERNANDO $5,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $85.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,085.50 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF APR-11-2013 - JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF APR-11-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF APR-11-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF ONLY. PLAINTIFF IS REPRESENTED BY FRED TAFRESHI--CCSF. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 85.50 - SERVED FEB-10-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MARTINS, FERNANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $5,000.00 FILED BY CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TAX COLLECTOR AS TO DEFENDANT MARTINS, FERNANDO ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-11-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less