This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 13:49:12 (UTC).

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO VS. ALL PERSONS CLAIMING ANY INTEREST OR LIEN UPON THE

Case Summary

On 05/15/2013 CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALL PERSONS CLAIMING ANY INTEREST OR LIEN UPON THE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1420

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Defendants

JOINT POWERS BOARD C/O SAN MATEO DISTRICT PLANNING & DEVELOPMENT

SAN FRANCISCO MARKET CORPORATION

SAN FRANCISCO PRODUCE ASSOCIATION

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO SOUTHERN PACIFIC COMPANY

ALL PERSONS CLAIMING ANY INTEREST OR LIEN UPON THE REAL PROPERTY HEREIN DESCRIBED, OR ANY PART THEREOF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WONG, VICTORIA

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEYSCITY HALL, ROOM 234

1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Pl

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorney

SILVER, STEPHEN A.

Attorney at DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION LEGAL DIVISION

595 Market Street, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER FOR PUBLISHING AND POSTING OF SUMMONS (NO S.A.S.E., COPY IN DEPT. 206'S OUTBOX)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SERVED OCT-07-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO MARKET CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SERVED OCT-07-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JOINT POWERS BOARD C/O SAN MATEO DISTRICT PLANNING & DEVELOPMENT

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION UNDER DESTROYED LAND RECORDS RELIEF LAW FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-25-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-13-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO JAN-15-2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

STIPULATION

STIPULATION TO DISCLAIM INTEREST FILED BY CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO MARKET CORPORATION

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-13-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: 1) THE CITY IS ENTITLED TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN IT'S FAVOR PURSUANT TO THE TERMS OF THE COURT'S JUNE 30, 2014 ORDER, ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBIT A. 2) THE CITY IS THE PREVAILING PARTY IN THIS ACTION. 3) PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATION BETWEEN CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION AND STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION'S DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST, FILED JUNE 26, 2014 IN THIS ACTION, THE CITY HAS WAIVED ANY CLAIM OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AGAINST THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, AND THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA HAS WAIVED ANY CLAIM OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AGAINST THE CITY. THEREFORE, THE CITY SHALL NOT RECOVER ANY FEES OR COSTS AGAINST THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, NOR SHALL THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA RECOVER ANY FEES OR COSTS AGAINST THE CITY. (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT WAS ENTERED VIA EX PARTE APPLICATION ON JUNE 30, 2014. JUDGE: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY, CLERK: M. GOODMAN, NOT REPORTED (D501)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JUL-02-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SECOND AMENDED, FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, ND JUDGMENT. (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIFTH AMENDED DEC OF JOHN UPDIKE IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT UNDER DESTROYED LAND RECORDS RELIEF LAW FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPOS OF STIPULATION BETWEEN PLTFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND STATE OF CA DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION AND STATE OF CA DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION'S DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST, FIFTH AMENDED DEC OF JOHN UPDIKE IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT UNDER DESTROYED LAND RECORDS RELIEF LAW FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION BETWEEN PLTFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND STATE OF CA DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION AND STATE OF CA DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION'S DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST FILED BY CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IS CONTINUED TO JULY 2, 2014 AT 9:30AM IN DEPT. 501. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION FILED AN OPPOSITION BUT FAILED TO COMPLY WITH SF LOCAL RULES 2.6B. PARTY FAILED TO PROVIDE COURTESY COPIES OF THEIR PAPERS TO THE COURT. NOTICE FOR JULY 2, 2014 IS WAIVED BY BOTH PARTIES. JUDGE RONALD EVANS QUIDACHAY, CLERK: M. OLOPERNES, NOT REPORTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2013
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR PUBLISHING AND POSTING OF SUMMONS (NO S.A.S.E., COPY IN DEPT. 206'S OUTBOX)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • DocketCOPYING FEES (1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION UNDER DESTROYED LAND RECORDS RELIEF LAW FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • DocketCOPYING FEES (1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDING ACTION UNDER DESTROYED LAND RECORDS RELIEF LAW FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JOHN UPDIKE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketQUIET TITLE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO DEFENDANT ALL PERSONS CLAIMING ANY INTEREST OR LIEN UPON THE REAL PROPERTY HEREIN DESCRIBED, OR ANY PART THEREOF SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:EXEMPT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******1420
Case Title:CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO VS. ALL PERSONS CLAIMING ANY INTEREST OR LIEN UPON THE
Court Date:JUN-24-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Entry Of Judgment
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, June 24, 2014, line 5. PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO's Motion For Entry Of JudgmentContinued to July 15, 2014. Department of Transportation filed an opposition but failed to comply with SF Local Rules 2.6B. Party failed to provide courtesy copies of their papers to the Court. = (501/REQ)