This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 11:36:58 (UTC).

CHUN HON KWAN ET AL VS. WASHINGTON WONG ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 CHUN HON KWAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WASHINGTON WONG. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RONALD E. QUIDACHAY, TERI L. JACKSON, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II and SUZANNE R. BOLANOS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4969

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

TERI L. JACKSON

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

SUZANNE R. BOLANOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KWAN, WAI TAI (WIFE)

KWAN, AMY Y.

KWAN, CHUN HON (HUSBAND)

KASKANLIAN, NICK AS TRUSTEE OF THE NICHOLAS A. KASKANLIAN 2006 REVOCABLE INTER-VIVOS TRUST ( PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-16-554969)

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

WONG, WASHINGTON

W.WONG CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-17-556747)

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ( (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-16-554969)

WONG, WASHINGTON (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE CGC-16-556747)

RYAN ENGINEERING, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, (DEFENDANTS FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-16-554969)

Cross Defendants and Defendants

ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

RYAN ENGINEERING, INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

RYAN ENGINEERING, INC. (CONSOLIDATED FROM #CGC-17-556747)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MADDEN, ROSS MCLAURAN

Attorney at ROSS MCLAURAN MADDEN

154 Rivoli Street

San Francisco, CA 94117

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WILCOX, WENDY

Attorney at SKANE WILCOX LLP

33 New Montgomery St Ste 1250

San Francisco, CA 94105

LESHIN, IRA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF IRA LESHIN

21 Tamal Vista Blvd. Suite 209

Corte Madera, CA 94925

KIM, JENNIFER J.

Attorney at ROPERS MAJESKI, ET AL

1001 Marshall Street, Ste 500

Redwood City, CA 94063

HEDGER, JOHN C.

Attorney at SKANE WILCOX LLP

33 New Montgomery Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94105

AGAJANIAN, TIM M.

Attorney at ROPERS, MAJESKI, KOHN & BENTLEY

1001 Marshall Street Suite 500

Redwood City, CA 94063

KOHLS, DANIEL V

Attorney at HANSEN, KOHLS, JONES, SOMMER & JACOB, LLP

1520 Eureka Rd. Ste. 100

Roseville, CA 95661-2849

VARNIS, JR., RICHARD W.

Attorney at MOKRI VANIS & JONES LLP

1320 Willow Pass Road, Suite 602

Concord, CA 94520

KINNEY, ANSEL DUNCAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ANSEL D. KINNEY

400 Harbor Drive, Suite E

Sausalito, CA 94965

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

VARNIS, JR., RICHARD W.

Attorney at MOKRI VANIS & JONES LLP

1320 Willow Pass Road, Suite 602

Concord, CA 94520

KINNEY, ANSEL DUNCAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ANSEL D. KINNEY

400 Harbor Drive, Suite E

Sausalito, CA 94965

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 62616921) FILED BY DEFENDANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (NO COPY TO ENDORSE PROVIDED)

DECLARATION OF ROSS MADDEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NICK KASKANLIANS EX

DECLARATION OF ROSS MADDEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NICK KASKANLIANS EX PARTE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62178459) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASKANLIAN, NICK AS TRUSTEE OF THE NICHOLAS A. KASKANLIAN 2006 REVOCABLE INTER-VIVOS TRUST ( PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-16-554969)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NICK KASK

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NICK KASKANLIANS EX PARTE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62178459) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASKANLIAN, NICK AS TRUSTEE OF THE NICHOLAS A. KASKANLIAN 2006 REVOCABLE INTER-VIVOS TRUST ( PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-16-554969)

PLAINTIFF NICK KASKANLIANS EX PARTE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62178459) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASKANLIAN, NICK AS TRUSTEE OF THE NICHOLAS A. KASKANLIAN 2006 REVOCABLE INTER-VIVOS TRUST ( PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-16-554969)

PLAINTIFF NICK KASKANLIANS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPP

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62075871) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASKANLIAN, NICK AS TRUSTEE OF THE NICHOLAS A. KASKANLIAN 2006 REVOCABLE INTER-VIVOS TRUST ( PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-16-554969)

PLAINTIFF NICK KASKANLIANS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION T

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62075871) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASKANLIAN, NICK AS TRUSTEE OF THE NICHOLAS A. KASKANLIAN 2006 REVOCABLE INTER-VIVOS TRUST ( PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-16-554969)

PLAINTIFF NICK KASKANLIANS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDA

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62075871) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASKANLIAN, NICK AS TRUSTEE OF THE NICHOLAS A. KASKANLIAN 2006 REVOCABLE INTER-VIVOS TRUST ( PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-16-554969)

Amended Notice of Motion and MSJ

AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (TRANSACTION ID # 100034974) FILED BY DEFENDANT (CONSOLIDATED CASE) FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ( (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-16-554969) HEARING SET FOR JUN-15-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62594023) FILED BY DEFENDANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER K. LETULLE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER K. LETULLE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 62594023) FILED BY DEFENDANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 62594023) FILED BY DEFENDANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTI

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 62594023) FILED BY DEFENDANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 62589291): KIM, JENNIFER J. SUBSTITUTED FOR WILCOX, WENDY AS ATTORNEY FOR W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Notice of Entry of Order Granting Def Fire Insurance MSJ

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100051295) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE ( (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE NO. CGC-16-554969)

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62571410) FILED BY DEFENDANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER K. LETULLE IN SUPPORT OF W. WONG CONSTRUCTION

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER K. LETULLE IN SUPPORT OF W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 62571410) FILED BY DEFENDANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5218A24M026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W1718A17M032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : B1418924J001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1418822M012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5218627M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : B5218412M007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W1518316M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W6618315M011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4918202M011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R8017B29J008

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60126307) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWAN, CHUN HON (HUSBAND) KWAN, WAI TAI (WIFE) KWAN, AMY Y. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17024065) (TRANSACTION ID # 17024065) FILED BY DEFENDANT WONG, WASHINGTON (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY (TRANSACTION ID # 59984033) FILED BY DEFENDANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59962830) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT RYAN ENGINEERING, INC. ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59946346) FILED BY DEFENDANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59920961), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWAN, CHUN HON (HUSBAND) KWAN, WAI TAI (WIFE) KWAN, AMY Y. SERVED DEC-01-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE DEC-01-2016 AS TO DEFENDANT WONG, WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59920961), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWAN, CHUN HON (HUSBAND) KWAN, WAI TAI (WIFE) KWAN, AMY Y. SERVED OCT-28-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE OCT-28-2016 AS TO DEFENDANT W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KWAN, CHUN HON (HUSBAND) KWAN, WAI TAI (WIFE) KWAN, AMY Y. AS TO DEFENDANT WONG, WASHINGTON W. WONG CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-22-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-20-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-27-2017 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4969
Case Title:CHUN HON KWAN ET AL VS. WASHINGTON WONG ET AL
Court Date:APR-24-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / Fire Insurance Exhange'S Notice Of Of Motion For Summary Judgment
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for April 24, 2018 line 2.DEFENDANT (CONSOLIDATED CASE) FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE's Motion For Summary JudgmentOFF CALENDAR, re-noticed for June 15, 2018. = (501/SRB)


Case Number:*******4969
Case Title:CHUN HON KWAN ET AL VS. WASHINGTON WONG ET AL
Court Date:JUN-15-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed By Fire Insurance Exchange
Rulings: Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Friday June 15, 2018 line 2.DEFENDANT (CONSOLIDATED CASE) FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed By Fire Insurance ExchangeContinued to June 29, 2018. Parties failed to provide curtesy copies. (Super. Ct. San Francisco County, Local Rules, rule 2.7.) Parties shall provide curtesy copies to Dept. 501 by June 20, 2018 with cover sheets indicating the new hearing date. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******4969
Case Title:CHUN HON KWAN ET AL VS. WASHINGTON WONG ET AL
Court Date:JUN-29-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed By Fire Insurance Exchange
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Friday June 29, 2018 line 1.DEFENDANT (CONSOLIDATED CASE) FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed By Fire Insurance ExchangeGRANTED, subject to opposition of clarification regarding possible stipulation for continuance. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******4969
Case Title:CHUN HON KWAN ET AL VS. WASHINGTON WONG ET AL
Court Date:JUL-05-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed By Fire Insurance Exchange
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for ThursdayJuly 5, 2018 line 1.DEFENDANT (CONSOLIDATED CASE) FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed By Fire Insurance ExchangeGRANTED. Contract interpretation is an issue of law. Moving party shifted its burden to show that the damage and cause of damage alleged in the complaint is excluded from coverage under the policy. Opposition party failed to create a triable issue of fact. Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice is GRANTED. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******4969
Case Title:CHUN HON KWAN ET AL VS. WASHINGTON WONG ET AL
Court Date:SEP-26-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion By Defendant And Cross-Complainant Washington Wong For Leave To File First Amended Cross-Complaint
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday September 26, 2018 line 3.DEFENDANT WASHINGTON WONG Notice Of Motion And Motion By Defendant And Cross-Complainant Washington Wong For Leave To File First Amended Cross-ComplaintGRANTED. First Amended Cross-Complaint (as attached to Reply) shall be filed and served forthwith. = (501/REQ)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RYAN ENGINEERING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NICHOLAS is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINNEY, ANSEL DUNCAN