This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:45:38 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER CALVI VS. VITO J. LBERATI et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 CHRISTOPHER CALVI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VITO J LBERATI. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8424

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALVI, CHRISTOPHER

Claimant

DIRECTOR OF THE DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS AS ADMINSTRATOR OF THE UNINSURED EMPLOYERS BENEFITS TRUST FUND

Defendants

LBERATI, VITO J.

SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

LIBERATI, VITO J.

DOES I THRU X

LIBERATI, VITO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HILLSMAN JOHN R

HILLSMAN, JOHN RALPH

Attorney at MCGUINN HILLSMAN & PALEFSKY

535 Pacific Ave

San Francisco, CA 94133

Claimant Attorney

JAGARD, CHRISTPER `

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS

1515 Clay Street, Ste 701

Oakland, CA 94162

Defendant Attorneys

PONTICELLO, BARRY W

Attorney at ENGLAND PONTICELLO & ST. CLAIR

701 B Street, Suite 1790

San Diego, CA 92101-8104

VENARDI, MARK

Attorney at VENARDI ZURADA LLP

700 Ygnacio Valley Rd, Ste 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

Defendant Silver bay Seafoods, LLCs Memorandum of Points and Authorit

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15029155) FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendan

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15029155) FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

Notice of Lodgement in Support of Defendant Silver bay Seafoods, LLCs

NOTICE OF LODGEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS, LLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15029155) FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

Declaration of Nadine D.Y. Adrian in Support of Defendant Silver bay S

DECLARATION OF NADINE D.Y. ADRIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS, LLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15029155) FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON DATE FOR DEFENDANT SILVER BAY,

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON DATE FOR DEFENDANT SILVER BAY, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15053029) FILED BY SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC CALVI, CHRISTOPHER

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFEN

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15125118) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Silver Bay Seafoods, LLCs Exhibit in Support of Its Motion f

EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15039258) FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON DATE FOR DEFENDANT SILVER BAY,

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON DATE FOR DEFENDANT SILVER BAY, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15047162) FILED BY SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

Defendant Silver bay Seafoods, LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion for Su

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15029155) FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC HEARING SET FOR APR-15-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:500.00)

Defendant Silver Bay Seafoods, LLCs Notice Motion and Motion for Recon

NOTICE MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15053149) FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC HEARING SET FOR MAR-13-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL DEREK B. JACOBSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MEMO

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL DEREK B. JACOBSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15125118) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100006581) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Silver Bay Seafoods, LLC reply in support of its motion for summary judgment or in the atlernative summary adjudication

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ATLERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 57248149) FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

Declaration Of Barry W. Ponticello In Support Of Defendant Silver Bay Seafoods, Llcs Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication

DECLARATION OF BARRY W. PONTICELLO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 57248149) FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Defendant silver bay seafoods LLC objections to evidence submitted by plaintiff in opposition to motion for summary judgment or in alternative for summary adjudication

OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 57248149) FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS UNDISPUTED FACT STATEMENT IN SUPPORT

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS UNDISPUTED FACT STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15125118) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-04-2016 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER BRIAN BROSNAHAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100013852) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-21-2016 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON MAY-09-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PER STIPULATED EX PARTE ORDER FILED 2/10/16. ALL FURTHER CONTINUANCES OF THE TRIAL DATE MUST BE SOUGHT BY NOTICED MOTION ONLY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 100013736) FILED BY CALVI, CHRISTOPHER SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 100013736) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58149648) FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER CALVI'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. THE PROPOSED NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION CLAIM IS NOT TIME BARRED. FIRST, THE 3 YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS APPLIES. SECOND, EVEN IF THE COURT APPLIED STATE LAW, THE CLAIM WOULD BE TIMELY UNDER THE RELATION BACK DOCTRINE. THE PREJUDICE TO DEFENDANT IS MINIMAL GIVEN THE CURRENT TRIAL DATE AND BECAUSE DISCOVERY REMAINS OPEN. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; REPORTER : MELANIE GHENO, CSR # 7489 =302/EHG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100007678) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER AS TO DEFENDANT LIBERATI, VITO J. SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC DOES I THRU X

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2013
  • DECLARATION OF JOHN R. HILLSMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLTFF'S OPPOS TO DEFS DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • INDEX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES CITED IN SUPPORT OF PLTFF'S MEMO OF P&A IN OPPOS TO DEFS DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LIBERATI, VITO (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC HEARING SET FOR APR-26-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER SERVED FEB-05-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER SERVED FEB-02-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LIBERATI, VITO J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVI, CHRISTOPHER AS TO DEFENDANT LIBERATI, VITO J. SILVER BAY SEAFOODS LLC DOES I THRU X SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less