This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:40:43 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER BAKKIE et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 10/24/2007 CHRISTOPHER BAKKIE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4424

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED

BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

FREIGHTLINER LLC

EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

ERICSSON INC.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

FOSTER WHEELER LLC FROM THE THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION (FALSE REPRESENTATION) AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES

DOES 1-8500

QUALITY TIRE ENTERPRISES, INC.

ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS INC., F/K/A HARCROS CHEMICALS INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HARRISONS & CROSFIELD (PACIFIC) INC.

OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.

SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

F B TIRE

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC FKA FREIGHTLINER LLC

ITW FINSIHING LLC

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

FOX, MICHAEL L.

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Stuart Tower,8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

CLAPP, JAMES BRENNAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES B. CLAPP

1611 Telegraph Avenue, Suite 310

Oakland, CA 94612

ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM HENRY

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & ASSOCIATES, LLP

One Kaiser Plaza, Suite 625

Oakland, CA 94612

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Ctr., # 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

OSTHIMER, CHARLES EDWARD

Attorney at LECLAIRRYAN, LLP

44 Montgomery Street, 18Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94104-4705

NEVOLO, GARY JAMES

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GARY J. NEVOLO

425 California St, 17Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

CUNNINGHAM, JAMES PATRICK

Attorney at CARROLL, BURDICK & MCDONOUGH

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

BRYDON, JOHN R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

HARRIS, ESQ., JULIE

Attorney at NOVELIS CORPORATION

6060 Parkland Boulevard

Mayfield Heights, OH 44124

RAUCH, WILLIAM DECKER

44 Montgomery St., Ste. 1210

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

NELSON, EVAN CRAIG

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

135 Main Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

VEJNOSKA, L CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

Attorney at BASSI,MARTINI,EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH-ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18632016) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC FKA FREIGHTLINER LLC (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF FOSTER WHEELER LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, LOSS OF CONSORTIUM, WRONGFUL DEATH ??? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19622966) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22874335) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Request For Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24186246) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

EXHIBIT F TO DECLARATION OF HELEN A . CHANG

EXHIBIT F TO DECLARATION OF HELEN A . CHANG (TRANSACTION ID # 24397706) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL NOVELIS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 28890271) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY

PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE TO NOVELIS CORPORATION?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM ARGUING OR PRESENTING ANY EVIDENCE REGARDING ANY ECONOMIC LOSSES

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO NOVELIS CORPORATIONS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM ARGUING OR PRESENTING ANY EVIDENCE REGARDING ANY ECONOMIC LOSSES (TRANSACTION ID # 28890271) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY

PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO NOVELIS CORPORATION?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF KENNETH COHEN

OPPOSITION TO NOVELIS CORPORATIONS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF KENNETH COHEN (TRANSACTION ID # 28890271) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY

ANSWER OF ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH- ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18554269) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

PLAINTIFFS? SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.?S PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.S PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 22089349) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY

EXHIBIT H TO DECLARATION OF HELEN A . CHANG

EXHIBIT H TO DECLARATION OF HELEN A . CHANG (TRANSACTION ID # 24397706) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

PLAINTIFFS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 25418635) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, STATEMENT OF DAMAGES, ETC. (TRANSACTION ID # 26140404) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED SERVED APR-15-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT QUALITY TIRE ENTERPRISES, INC.

DEFENDANT NOVELIS CORPORATION?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM ARGUING OR PRESENTING ANY EVIDENCE REGARDING ANY ECONOMIC LOSSES

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM ARGUING OR PRESENTING ANY EVIDENCE REGARDING ANY ECONOMIC LOSSES [MIL #1](TRANSACTION ID # 28218304) FILED BY DEFENDANT NOVELIS CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 28705938) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED

DECLARATION OF ANNE T. ACUNA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO CONFORM TO PROOF AT TRIAL AND MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT

DECLARATION OF ANNE T. ACUNA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO CONFORM TO PROOF AT TRIAL AND MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT (TRANSACTION ID # 28890271) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY

JUDGMENT ON VERDICT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ON VERDICT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION $200,000.00 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $200,000.00, PLAINTIFFS' ENTITLEMENT TO ORDINARY COSTS, IF ANY, SHALL BE DETERMINED BY THE COURT IN SUBSEQUENT PROCEEDINGS.

352 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2010
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W3609B02J019 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 32810545) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS ON CALENDAR JUN-09-2010 AT 11:00 AM IN D-602 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SEE ORDER SIGNED AND FILED THIS DATE. JUDGE C. KIESSELBACH, CLERK N. REGAS, CT REPORTER C. YOUNT (602)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR JUN-09-2010 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 31375550) FILED BY DEFENDANT NOVELIS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF E-SERVICE: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS; DECLARATION OF LLOYD F. LEROY IN SUPPORT THEREOF; [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING UNION CARBIDE CORPORATIONS MOTION TO TAX COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 31332906) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF LLOYD F. LEROY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO UNION CARBIDES MOTION TO TAX COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 31332906) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO UNION CARBIDE CORPORATIONS MOTION TO TAX COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 31332906) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31223714) AS TO DEFENDANT NOVELIS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
414 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18497830) FILED BY DEFENDANT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • EATON ELECTRICAL INC.S OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEM AND OR COMMISSIONER ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 18363565) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18363565) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF TERRY BAKKIE UNDER C.C.P. ?? 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 17803404) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17799247) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, TERRY AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE (TRANSACTION ID # 17617464) (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAKKIE, CHRISTOPHER AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED BAKKIE, CHARLES A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TERRY BAKKIE, AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVID BAKKIE, DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-16-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less