This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/14/2018 at 07:17:51 (UTC).

CHRISTINA ORTEGA VS. CITY OF SAN FRANCISCO et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2013 CHRISTINA ORTEGA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CITY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN, JOHN K. STEWART, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH and CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5710

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

JOHN K. STEWART

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTEGA, CHRISTINA AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF SAN FRANCISCO

COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF SAN FRANCISCO, LLC

CBRE, INC.

CB RICHARD ELLIS, INC.

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Cross Defendants

ROES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

EAN, LLC DBA ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EAN HOLDINGS LLC, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ENTERPRISE-RENT-A-CAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHERMEZIAN, RAYMOND

Attorney at RAYMOND GHERMEZIAN

8383 Wilshire Blvd Ste 950

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RANUCCI, JOHN W

Attorney at LOMBARDI, LOPER & CONANT, LLPLAKE MERRITT PLAZA

1999 Harrison Street, Ste 2600

Oakland, CA 94612

TYSON, JR., ROBERT F.

Attorney at TYSON & MENDES LLP

5661 La Jolla Boulevard

La Jolla, CA 92037

ASIANO, ANN MARILYNNE

Attorney at BRADLEY,CURLEY,ASIANO,BARABEE ABEL & KOWALSKI A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1100 Larkspur Landing Circle,, Suite 200

Larkspur, CA 94939

 

Court Documents

Defendant Cb Richard Ellis, Inc.s Notice Of Motion For Summary Judgmen

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57948932) FILED BY DEFENDANT CB RICHARD ELLIS, INC. HEARING SET FOR DEC-18-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:500.00)

Declaration Of Shelly Mesecke In Support Of Cbres Motion For Summary J

DECLARATION OF SHELLY MESECKE IN SUPPORT OF CBRES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57948932) FILED BY DEFENDANT CB RICHARD ELLIS, INC.

Declaration Of Brad Steidl In Support Of Cb Richard Ellis Motion For S

DECLARATION OF BRAD STEIDL IN SUPPORT OF CB RICHARD ELLIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF CHRISTINA ORTEGA (TRANSACTION ID # 57948932) FILED BY DEFENDANT CB RICHARD ELLIS, INC.

Declaration Of Janice Walshokin Support Of Cbres Motion For Summary Ju

DECLARATION OF JANICE WALSHOKIN SUPPORT OF CBRES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57948932) FILED BY DEFENDANT CB RICHARD ELLIS, INC.

Defendant Cbres Notice Of Lodgment In Support Of Its Motion For Summar

NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57948932) FILED BY DEFENDANT CB RICHARD ELLIS, INC.

Defendant Cb Richard Ellis Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Sup

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF CHRISTINA ORTEGA (TRANSACTION ID # 57948932) FILED BY DEFENDANT CB RICHARD ELLIS, INC.

Defendant Cbres Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion For S

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57948932) FILED BY DEFENDANT CB RICHARD ELLIS, INC.

Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Cb Richa

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CB RICHARD ELLIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF CHRISTINA ORTEGA (TRANSACTION ID # 57948932) FILED BY DEFENDANT CB RICHARD ELLIS, INC.

Defendant City and County of San Franciscos Notice of Motion and Motio

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57956683) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO HEARING SET FOR DEC-18-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:EXEMPT)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant City and

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCOS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57956683) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendan

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCOS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57956683) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Declaration of John W. Ranucci in Support of Defendant City and County

DECLARATION OF JOHN W. RANUCCI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCOS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57956683) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Declaration of San Francisco International Airport Senior Principal Pr

DECLARATION OF SAN FRANCISCO INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT SENIOR PRINCIPAL PROPERTY MANAGER GIGI RICASA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCOS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57956683) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Declaration of City and County of San Francisco Airport Communications

DECLARATION OF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AIRPORT COMMUNICATIONS DISPATCHER MICHAEL KONG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCOS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57956683) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 57956683) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCOS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CB

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CB RICHARD ELLIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58252274) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCOS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE IN

OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CB RICHARD ELLIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58252274) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DECLARATION OF JOHN W. RANUCCI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY

DECLARATION OF JOHN W. RANUCCI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCOS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CB RICHARD ELLIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58252274) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2016
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R7816108R025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R7816108M024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W8116108R012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W8116108M011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : R0215C07M010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : R8315A08R013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : R8315A08M012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : B1415A02M010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : B1415A02R009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1415A02M008

    Read MoreRead Less
155 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL OR SELF-REPRESENTED CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) SET FOR AUG-12-2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. THE JUN-11-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-30-2014 CONTINUED TO JUN-11-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF SAN FRANCISCO, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:$EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT EAN, LLC DBA ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ROES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF SAN FRANCISCO, LLC (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ORTEGA, CHRISTINA AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CITY OF SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-30-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-27-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-07-2014 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less