This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 11:41:12 (UTC).

CHEVY'S ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED VS. WARREN L. SIMMONS JR et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2012 CHEVY'S ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WARREN L SIMMONS JR. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN, CYNTHIA M. LEE, MARLA J. MILLER and RONALD E. QUIDACHAY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4918

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

CYNTHIA M. LEE

MARLA J. MILLER

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEVY'S ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS

SIMMONS JR, WARREN L. SCOTTER

SIMMONS, NANCY

DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEYER ALLAN

STEYER, ALLAN

Attorney at STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

One California St, Ste 300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

VU, NHAN T

Attorney at WILLENKEN WILSON LOH & DELGADO LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd Ste 3850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEVY'S ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT SIMMONS JR, WARREN L. SCOTTER SIMMONS, NANCY ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-06-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-03-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-19-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES NTC OF DEMURRER AND APPENDIX FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMMONS JR, WARREN L. SCOTTER SIMMONS, NANCY ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS HEARING SET FOR DEC-24-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1350.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOS TO DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEVY'S ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

REPLY

REPLY TO PLTF'S MEMO OF P & A IN OPPOS. TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT/ALT MTN TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMMONS JR, WARREN L. SCOTTER SIMMONS, NANCY ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS

ORDER

ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEVY'S ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMMONS JR, WARREN L. SCOTTER SIMMONS, NANCY ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMMONS JR, WARREN L. SCOTTER SIMMONS, NANCY ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-07-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAR-06-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR FEB-03-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER : STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THE CONFIDENTIAL TREATMENT OF MATERIALS

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEVY'S ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS OF EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE; MEMO AND DEC FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEVY'S ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2113A23M022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2113A23M021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1513927M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2113911C008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2113619C040

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2113211J041

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2113208J047

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : W2012C03M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R1612B26R014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1350; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R1612B26F013

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2013
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS WARREN SIMMONS, NANCY SIMMONS AND ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 501 TO BE HEARD ON JANUARY 28, 2013 AT 9:30 AM. MOVING PARTY IS ORDERED TO PROVIDE A COURTESY COPY OF THE OPERATIVE COMPLAINT TO DEPARTMENT 501, WITH A COVER LETTER REFLECTING THE NEW HEARING DATE, NO LATER THAN JANUARY 7, 2013 AT 4:00 PM. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; COURT REPORTER: LAVENNA WARD, CSR # 7077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-07-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO PLTF'S MEMO OF P ' A IN OPPOS. TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT/ALT MTN TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMMONS JR, WARREN L. SCOTTER SIMMONS, NANCY ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT CONTINUED FROM DEC-24-2012 TO LAW AND MOTION AT JAN-07-2013, 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 302 PER THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOS TO DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEVY'S ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT RE-NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMMONS JR, WARREN L. SCOTTER SIMMONS, NANCY ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS HEARING SET FOR JAN-07-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMMONS JR, WARREN L. SCOTTER SIMMONS, NANCY ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES NTC OF DEMURRER AND APPENDIX FILED BY DEFENDANT SIMMONS JR, WARREN L. SCOTTER SIMMONS, NANCY ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS HEARING SET FOR DEC-24-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEVY'S ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT SIMMONS JR, WARREN L. SCOTTER SIMMONS, NANCY ESTATE OF WARREN L. SIMMONS DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-06-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-03-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-19-2013 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VU NHAN T. ESQ.