This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 12:22:13 (UTC).

CHERIFA BELABBAS VS. HASHICORP INC., A CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 CHERIFA BELABBAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HASHICORP INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2952

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELABBAS, CHERIFA

Defendants

BLAYTHORNE, HOPE

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

HASHICORP INC., A CORPORATION

KOCSY, BRIAN

PILLOUD, CLARESE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAHBAZI, MEENOO

Attorney at CHAHBAZI LAW PLLC

4742 N. 24Th Street Suite 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

Complaint

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68447997) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELABBAS, CHERIFA AS TO DEFENDANT HASHICORP INC., A CORPORATION BLAYTHORNE, HOPE KOCSY, BRIAN PILLOUD, CLARESE DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-03-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-27-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-10-2023

Civil Case coversheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68447997) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELABBAS, CHERIFA CASE DESIGNATED COMPLEX LITIGATION

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68447997) TO PLAINTIFF BELABBAS, CHERIFA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68475456), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELABBAS, CHERIFA SERVED NOV-29-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT HASHICORP INC., A CORPORATION

Proof of Service of Summons Complaint and Other Documents as to Brian

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68617406), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELABBAS, CHERIFA SERVED DEC-07-2022, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE DEC-07-2022 AS TO DEFENDANT KOCSY, BRIAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68617406), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELABBAS, CHERIFA SERVED DEC-07-2022, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE DEC-07-2022 AS TO DEFENDANT KOCSY, BRIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68475456), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELABBAS, CHERIFA SERVED NOV-29-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT HASHICORP INC., A CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68447997) TO PLAINTIFF BELABBAS, CHERIFA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H2522B28F003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68447997) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELABBAS, CHERIFA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68447997) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELABBAS, CHERIFA AS TO DEFENDANT HASHICORP INC., A CORPORATION BLAYTHORNE, HOPE KOCSY, BRIAN PILLOUD, CLARESE DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-03-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less