This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 03:02:29 (UTC).

CHAU NGOC HA VS. LA PRIMERA NUTRICION, INC et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2013 CHAU NGOC HA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LA PRIMERA NUTRICION, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5310

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HA, CHAU NGOC

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

LA PRIMERA NUTRICION, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARR, DENNIS MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS M. CARR

825 Van Ness Avenue, Suite 407

San Francisco, CA 94109

 

Court Documents

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-09-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-10-2014 CONTINUED TO SEP-09-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-10-2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE APR-23-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-12-2014 CONTINUED TO APR-23-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HA, CHAU NGOC AS TO DEFENDANT LA PRIMERA NUTRICION, INC DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-12-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-06-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-18-2014 (Fee:370.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-09-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-10-2014 CONTINUED TO SEP-09-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JUN-10-2014 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-10-2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE APR-23-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-12-2014 CONTINUED TO APR-23-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HA, CHAU NGOC AS TO DEFENDANT LA PRIMERA NUTRICION, INC DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-12-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-06-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-18-2014 (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA PRIMERA NUTRICION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARR, DENNIS MICHAEL