This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 23:48:56 (UTC).

CHASE RODRIGUEZ VS. PROTRANSPORT-1 LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2012 CHASE RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PROTRANSPORT-1 LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2733

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSO

RATOZA, ANDREW

SHOUP, ROYAL

RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED

MORGADO, CARLOS INDIVIDUALLY, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PROTRANSPORT-1 LC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PROTRANSPORT-1, LLC

PROTRANSPORT-1 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL.

Cross Defendants

ROES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

INNOVATIVE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

INNOVATIVE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUMENTHAL, NORMAN B

Attorney at BLUMENTHAL, NORDREHAUG & BHOWMIK

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN, PATRICK WILLIAM

Attorney at JORDAN LAW GROUP

1010 "B" Street, Suite 320

San Rafael, CA 94901

Cross Defendant Attorney

SUPMAN, JENNIFER L

Attorney at MANNING & KASS, ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTER LLP

121 Spear Street, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PROTRANSPORT-1, LLC JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PROTRANSPORT-1, LLC AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ROES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED SHOUP, ROYAL RATOZA, ANDREW MORGADO, CARLOS INDIVIDUALLY, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56645705) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED SHOUP, ROYAL RATOZA, ANDREW MORGADO, CARLOS INDIVIDUALLY, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, LITIGATION EXPENSES AND SERVICE AWARDS

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES (TRANSACTION ID # 57109256) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED SHOUP, ROYAL RATOZA, ANDREW MORGADO, CARLOS INDIVIDUALLY, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED HEARING SET FOR MAY-13-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, LITIGATION EXPENSES AND SERVICE AWARDS

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, LITIGATION EXPENSES AND SERVICE AWARDS (TRANSACTION ID # 57109256) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED SHOUP, ROYAL RATOZA, ANDREW MORGADO, CARLOS INDIVIDUALLY, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: FINAL JUDGMENT; JUDGMENT ENTERED WHEREBY PLAINTIFFS AND ALL SETTLEMENT CLASS MEMBERS SHALL TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT EXCEPT AS EXPRESSLY SET FORTH IN THE AGREEMENT AND DEFENDANT SHALL TAKE NOTHING FROM CROSS-DEFENDANT EXCEPT AS EXPRESSLY SET FORTH IN THE AGREEMENT (SEE SCANNED JUDGMENT FOR FULL DETAILS)

Notice of Entry of Judgment and Final Approval Order

NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND FINAL APPROVAL ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 57244602) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED SHOUP, ROYAL RATOZA, ANDREW MORGADO, CARLOS INDIVIDUALLY, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-30-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED

REPLY

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PROTRANSPORT-1, LLC

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANT PROTRANSPORT-1 LLC'S DEMURRER WITH LEAVE TO AMEND TO THE FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (COPY OF ORDER IN DEPT. 301 OUTBOX)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 17.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PROTRANSPORT-1, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-23-2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER RONALD S. BUSHNER.

STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER AMENDING THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

FEE PAID ON STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER AMENDING THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56496455) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED SHOUP, ROYAL RATOZA, ANDREW MORGADO, CARLOS INDIVIDUALLY, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:20.00)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57109308) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED SHOUP, ROYAL RATOZA, ANDREW MORGADO, CARLOS INDIVIDUALLY, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED HEARING SET FOR MAY-13-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-30-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND FINAL APPROVAL ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 57244602) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED SHOUP, ROYAL RATOZA, ANDREW MORGADO, CARLOS INDIVIDUALLY, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: FINAL JUDGMENT; JUDGMENT ENTERED WHEREBY PLAINTIFFS AND ALL SETTLEMENT CLASS MEMBERS SHALL TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT EXCEPT AS EXPRESSLY SET FORTH IN THE AGREEMENT AND DEFENDANT SHALL TAKE NOTHING FROM CROSS-DEFENDANT EXCEPT AS EXPRESSLY SET FORTH IN THE AGREEMENT (SEE SCANNED JUDGMENT FOR FULL DETAILS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL APPROVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-13-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-13-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-13-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, PLAINTIFFS CHASE RODRIGUEZ, ROYAL SHOUP, ANDREW RATOZA, AND CARLOS MORGADO'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; REPORTER: DENISE DOUCETTE, CSR # 5963 (302/EHG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, PLAINTIFFS CHASE RODRIGUEZ, ROYAL SHOUP, ANDREW RATOZA AND CARLOS MORGADO'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, LITIGATION EXPENSES AND SERVICE AWARDS IS GRANTED. ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; REPORTER: DENISE DOUCETTE, CSR # 5963 (302/EHG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, FINAL APPROVAL HEARING IS OFF CALENDAR DUPLICATE ENTRY. (302/EHG)

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT PROTRANSPORT-1, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PROTRANSPORT-1, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT PROTRANSPORT-1, LLC (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT PROTRANSPORT-1, LLC (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT NTC OF MTN TO STRIKE; MEMO OF P & A AND POS FILED BY DEFENDANT PROTRANSPORT-1, LLC HEARING SET FOR NOV-02-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT NTC OF DEMURRER; MEMO OF P & A AND POS FILED BY DEFENDANT PROTRANSPORT-1, LLC HEARING SET FOR NOV-02-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ, CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT PROTRANSPORT-1 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-26-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-25-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-11-2012 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less