This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:47:37 (UTC).

CHARLES THORNTON VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2007 CHARLES THORNTON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4271

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

MRC HOLDINGS, INC. SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN CAN COMPANY

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

SEARIVER MARITIME, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

CHEVRON SHIPPING COMPANY

TODD SHIPYARDS CORP.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

APL LIMITED

FLOUR CORPORATION

DOES 1-8500

VIACOM CORPORATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

SANTA FE BRAUN, INC. AS SII TO C.F. BRAUN, INC.

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

BECHTEL CORPORATION/SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.

TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC.

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCDANIEL, MARIETTA ELIZABETH

Attorney at SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4106

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

YARON, GEORGE DIMITRI

Attorney at YARON & ASSOCIATES

601 California St. 21St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California St. Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PORT, ANDREW IRA

Attorney at EMARD, DANNOFF, PORT, TAMULSKI & PAETZOLD, LLP

49 Stevenson Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94105

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS

135 Main Street, Ste 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN LLP

101 Second St., Ste 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105-3606

KRAFT, ROBERT S

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16163362) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

Defendant SeaRiver Maritime, Inc.s Objection to Plfs Offer to Compromise Pursuant to CCP Section 998

OBJECTION TO PLTF'S OFFER TO COMPROMISE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 998 (TRANSACTION ID # 17295037) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEARIVER MARITIME, INC.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20348190) AS TO DEFENDANT MOORE SECURITIES COMPANY

Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 22967724) FILED BY ATTORNEY KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Stipulation and Order Re: Briefing Schedule and Continuance of Hearing Date on Defendant Dillingham Construction, N.A., Inc.?s Motion For Summary Judgment

FEE PAID ON STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION, N.A., INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 24668452) FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION, N.A., INC. (Fee:20.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 24967462) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THORNTON, CHARLES

Request for Dismissal with prejudice as to defendant Viacom Corporation successor by merger to CBS Corporation, fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation only. Each party to bear its own costs.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29554618) AS TO DEFENDANT VIACOM CORPORATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

MIL 14 - DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE IRRELEVANT ADVERTISING MATERIALS AND PHOTOGRAPHS DEPICTING ASBESTOS-CONTAINING PRODUCTS

MIL 14 - MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE IRRELEVANT ADVERTISING MATERIALS AND PHOTOGRAPHS DEPICTING ASBESTOS-CONTAINING PRODUCTS (TRANSACTION ID # 32821033) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Request for Dismissal as to Zurn Industries, LLC

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 38332792) AS TO DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.,

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER VIA E-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16024511) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE SECURITIES COMPANY

ANSWER OF FOSTER WHEELER LLC TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ??? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16339838) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Fee:335.00)

Chevron Products Companys Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19917839) AS TO DEFENDANT CHEVRON PRODUCTS COMPANY

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22673103) FILED BY DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

EXHIBIT A TO THE DECLARATION OF LAUREN M. HOROWITZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBIT A TO THE DECLARATION OF LAUREN M. HOROWITZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 24292226) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

Request for Dismisal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT FILED. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 24424493) AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES, LTD. APL LIMITED

MINUTES FOR SEP-16-2010 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR SEP-16-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 505

Request for Dismissal-Tosco Refining Company, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35508368) AS TO DEFENDANT TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC.

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Foster Wheeler LLC only, with a mutual waiver of costs.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37055934) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

187 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2015
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-03-2015. DISMISSAL FILED 11/24/15. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58212959)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-04-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-03-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. GIL PURCELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-04-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, BRENDA POSADA. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO DEC-30-2015 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF THORNTON, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
228 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16042333) FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION, N.A., INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER VIA E-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16024511) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE SECURITIES COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 16024511) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE SECURITIES COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16024511) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE SECURITIES COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16011693) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16002202) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15967465) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEARIVER MARITIME, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF THORNTON, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THORNTON, CHARLES AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEARIVER MARITIME, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where APL LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLOUR CORPORATION is a litigant