This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/25/2018 at 16:10:54 (UTC).

Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. Vs. Turner Funds Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Charles Schwab Co Inc against Turner Funds in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4262

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Teri L. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.

Defendants

Turner Investments Llc

Veracen L.P.

Kennedy, Michael , An Individual

Turner Funds

Turner, Robert , An Individual

Turner Holdings Gp Llc

Does 1-50, Inclusive

Turner Investments Holdings L.P.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER FUNDS TURNER INVESTMENTS LLC TURNER INVESTMENTS HOLDINGS L.P. TURNER HOLDINGS GP LLC VERACEN L.P. TURNER, ROBERT , AN INDIVIDUAL KENNEDY, MICHAEL , AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CHARLES S

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB AND CO., INC. S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REQUEST DEFAULT JUDGMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 62089183) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

DECLARATION OF ERIN E. DALY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB AND

DECLARATION OF ERIN E. DALY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB AND CO., INC. S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REQUEST DEFAULT JUDGMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 62089183) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB CO., INC. S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSI

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REQUEST DEFAULT JUDGMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 62089183) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

ORDER

ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. TO REQUEST DEFAULT JUDGMENTS

ORDER

ORDER - EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (FOR DEFENDANT ROBERT TURNER) TO RESPOND TO 7-16-18

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61896685) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER INVESTMENTS LLC

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (TURNER FUNDS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 61896565) AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER FUNDS

Proof of Service Summons (Amended)

AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT LEAVING COPIES WITH CHRIS HOLMES , COMPLIANCE OFFICER (TRANSACTION ID # 62073903), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. SERVED APR-16-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION, MAILING DATE APR-16-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT VERACEN L.P.

Declaration of Erin E. Daly Regarding Venue

DECLARATION OF ERIN E. DALY REGARDING VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 62074272) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 62062601) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. AS TO DEFENDANT VERACEN L.P.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 62074272) AS TO DEFENDANT VERACEN L.P.

Proof of Service Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61869076), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. SERVED FEB-26-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER INVESTMENTS HOLDINGS L.P.

ORDER

ORDER AND EX PARTE APPLICATION EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT TO 6-15-18

Defendant Robert Turners Answer to Complaint [Demand for Jury Trial]

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100042461) FILED BY DEFENDANT TURNER, ROBERT , AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62089183) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62188716) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

DECLARATION OF ERIN E. DALY REGARDING VENUE

DECLARATION OF ERIN E. DALY REGARDING VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 61896565) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W2118614F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4718601M009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4718416C020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1518213F007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100042461) FILED BY DEFENDANT TURNER, ROBERT , AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 62204980) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 62204980) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-22-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62188716) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (FOR DEFENDANT ROBERT TURNER) TO RESPOND TO 7-16-18

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61896565) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ERIN E. DALY REGARDING VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 61896565) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 61896565) AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61876779), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. SERVED MAR-08-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAR-09-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT VERACEN L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61876779) (TRANSACTION ID # 61876779), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. SERVED FEB-26-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61869076), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. SERVED FEB-21-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER INVESTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61869076), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. SERVED FEB-26-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER HOLDINGS GP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61869076), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. SERVED FEB-26-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER INVESTMENTS HOLDINGS L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. AS TO DEFENDANT TURNER FUNDS TURNER INVESTMENTS LLC TURNER INVESTMENTS HOLDINGS L.P. TURNER HOLDINGS GP LLC VERACEN L.P. TURNER, ROBERT , AN INDIVIDUAL KENNEDY, MICHAEL , AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less