This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 10:33:16 (UTC).

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. VS. KEITH M. STEEL & ANPEI LIN, COMMUNITY PROPERTY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/05/2015 CHARLES SCHWAB CO , INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against KEITH M STEEL ANPEI LIN, COMMUNITY PROPERTY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4334

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

Respondents

KEITH M. STEEL & ANPEI LIN, COMMUNITY PROPERTY

MEGAN LEITH STEEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WYNNE, GARRETT

Attorney at KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

450 Pacific Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94133

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57695907) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

Notice of Entry of Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 57695907) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S PETITION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED JUL-15-2015, SERVED JUL-14-2015 (TRANSACTION ID # 15209114) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. AS TO RESPONDENT KEITH M. STEEL & ANPEI LIN, COMMUNITY PROPERTY MEGAN LEITH STEEL

Declaraton of Francesca M. Lanpher In Support Of Petitioners Motion To

DECLARATION OF FRANCESCA M. LANPHER IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 15158055) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Confirm A

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 15158055) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

Notice Of Motion and Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 15158055) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. HEARING SET FOR AUG-11-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. AS TO RESPONDENT KEITH M. STEEL & ANPEI LIN, COMMUNITY PROPERTY MEGAN LEITH STEEL SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57695907) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 57695907) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. ORDER AND JUDGMENT SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; REPORTER : MELANIE GHENO, CSR # 7489 =302/EG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S PETITION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-11-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED JUL-15-2015, SERVED JUL-14-2015 (TRANSACTION ID # 15209114) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. AS TO RESPONDENT KEITH M. STEEL & ANPEI LIN, COMMUNITY PROPERTY MEGAN LEITH STEEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 15158055) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF FRANCESCA M. LANPHER IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 15158055) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 15158055) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 15158055) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. HEARING SET FOR AUG-11-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. AS TO RESPONDENT KEITH M. STEEL & ANPEI LIN, COMMUNITY PROPERTY MEGAN LEITH STEEL SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4334
Case Title:CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. VS. KEITH M. STEEL & ANPEI LIN, COMMUNITY PROPERTY ET AL
Court Date:AUG-11-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, August 11, 2015, Line 1, PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.'S Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award.Granted. No opposition filed. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/EG)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHARLES SCHWAB & CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WYNNE GARRETT RICHARD