This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 03:34:15 (UTC).

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. et al VS. CLASS ACTION WATCH, A NON-PROFIT FOUNDATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/24/2012 CHARLES SCHWAB CO INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against CLASS ACTION WATCH, A NON-PROFIT FOUNDATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2585

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION

CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC.

Respondents

DAVIDSON, KATHLEEN M.

CLASS ACTION WATCH, A NON-PROFIT FOUNDATION

DAVIDSON, JERRY L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MORALES, AUDETTE PAUL

Attorney at KEESAL YOUNG & LOGAN

450 Pacific Ave.

San Francisco, CA 94133

 

Court Documents

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC. AS TO RESPONDENT CLASS ACTION WATCH, A NON-PROFIT FOUNDATION DAVIDSON, JERRY L. DAVIDSON, KATHLEEN M. JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:450.00)

MINUTES FOR DEC-28-2012 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR DEC-28-2012 9:00 AM

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS' PETITION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM AMENDED ARBITRATION AWARD

ARBITRATION JUDGMENT

PURSUANT TO CRC 3.827 (A), THE AWARD OF THE ARBITRATOR IS HEREBY ENTERED AS JUDGMENT. IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2013
  • NTC OF RULING AND NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON PETITION AND MTN TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PURSUANT TO CRC 3.827 (A), THE AWARD OF THE ARBITRATOR IS HEREBY ENTERED AS JUDGMENT. IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS' PETITION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM AMENDED ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-28-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PETITIONERS CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC., THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION AND CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC'S MOTION TO CONFIRM AMENDED ARBITRATION AWARD WILL BE HEARD AT 9:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 608 BY JUDGE KARNOW, PURSUANT TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE. JUDGE MILLER HAS RECUSED HERSELF. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; COURT REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR # 7077

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR DEC-28-2012 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM AMENDED ARBITRATION AWARD HEARING SET FOR DEC-28-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 608

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC. (Fee:30.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • NOTICE OF MOTION ANMD MOTION TO CONFIRM AMENDED ARB AWARD FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC. HEARING SET FOR DEC-28-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC. AS TO RESPONDENT CLASS ACTION WATCH, A NON-PROFIT FOUNDATION DAVIDSON, JERRY L. DAVIDSON, KATHLEEN M. JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less