Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 23:24:16 (UTC).

CHARLES GARDINER VS. CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2010 CHARLES GARDINER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6823

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARDINER, CHARLES

Defendants

STUMWASSER, BEN

STEINWERT, SCOTT ,AN INDIVIDUAL

POTTER, PHYLLIS

PISANO, MARK

BEAN, MARY

WALLACE, SARAH LAYTON

CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 8-20

MOORE, LORI OGDEN

O'NEIL, JOHN

DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

FIXLER, CRAIG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

METCALF, AMANDA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF AMANDA METCALF

29 Marin Bay Park Court

San Rafael, CA 94901

WHITE, ROBERT EDWARD

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. WHITE

177 Post St. Stuite. 890

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorney

GARFIELD, HOWARD MICHAEL

Attorney at MECKLER BULGER TILSON MARICK & PEARSON LLP

465 California Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING IN PART, DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-03-2011 CONTINUED TO JUL-15-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES AS TO DEFENDANT CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STEINWERT, SCOTT ,AN INDIVIDUAL O'NEIL, JOHN BEAN, MARY POTTER, PHYLLIS WALLACE, SARAH LAYTON STUMWASSER, BEN FIXLER, CRAIG PISANO, MARK MOORE, LORI OGDEN DOES 8-20

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES AS TO DEFENDANT CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STEINWERT, SCOTT ,AN INDIVIDUAL O'NEIL, JOHN BEAN, MARY POTTER, PHYLLIS WALLACE, SARAH LAYTON STUMWASSER, BEN FIXLER, CRAIG PISANO, MARK MOORE, LORI OGDEN DOES 8-20

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-21-2011 CONTINUED TO DEC-09-2011 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER AFTER HEARING ON DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF

ORDER AFTER HEARING ON DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JOINDER

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STEINWERT, SCOTT ,AN INDIVIDUAL O'NEIL, JOHN BEAN, MARY POTTER, PHYLLIS WALLACE, SARAH LAYTON STUMWASSER, BEN FIXLER, CRAIG PISANO, MARK MOORE, LORI OGDEN (Fee:2460.00)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-09-2011 CONTINUED TO JAN-20-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

(AMENDED) NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES HEARING SET FOR DEC-23-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION AND MEMO OF P AND A IN SUPPORT OPT OPPOSITION TO PLTFS APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STEINWERT, SCOTT ,AN INDIVIDUAL O'NEIL, JOHN BEAN, MARY POTTER, PHYLLIS WALLACE, SARAH LAYTON STUMWASSER, BEN FIXLER, CRAIG PISANO, MARK MOORE, LORI OGDEN

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF JUAN A ARANEDA FILED BY DEFENDANT CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STEINWERT, SCOTT ,AN INDIVIDUAL O'NEIL, JOHN BEAN, MARY POTTER, PHYLLIS WALLACE, SARAH LAYTON STUMWASSER, BEN FIXLER, CRAIG PISANO, MARK MOORE, LORI OGDEN

REPLY

REPLY DEC. ROBERT E. WHITE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION OF PLTF'S FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER & ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AGAINST DEFT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-04-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO DISMISS ALL INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS. THE APR-20-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR SEP-11-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. JUN-04-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-11-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR SEP-11-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. JUN-04-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-04-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO DISMISS ALL INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS. THE APR-20-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STEINWERT, SCOTT ,AN INDIVIDUAL O'NEIL, JOHN BEAN, MARY POTTER, PHYLLIS WALLACE, SARAH LAYTON JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-09-2012 CONTINUED TO APR-20-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS; FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • DECLARATION OF AMANDA METCALF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES AS TO DEFENDANT CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STEINWERT, SCOTT ,AN INDIVIDUAL O'NEIL, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES SERVED JAN-07-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT STEINWERT, SCOTT ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES SERVED JAN-07-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STEINWERT, SCOTT ,AN INDIVIDUAL O'NEIL, JOHN HEARING SET FOR MAR-23-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:1230.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARDINER, CHARLES AS TO DEFENDANT CIRCLEPOINT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STEINWERT, SCOTT ,AN INDIVIDUAL O'NEIL, JOHN DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-03-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-28-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-19-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, ROBERT E.