This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/25/2016 at 18:18:27 (UTC).

CHARLES EVANS JR. ET AL VS. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 CHARLES EVANS JR filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6441

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenor Defendants

EVANS JR., CHARLES

EVANS, MARIAN

Defendants

FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS DOE 302

BRAND INSULATIONS, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS VEOLIA ES INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.)

BIGGE CRANE AND RIGGING CO.

QUAD C CORPORATION

GRINNELL LLC

TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.

PETER KIEWIT SONS, INC.

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

VEOLIA ES INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.

ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS INC

3M COMPANY

VICTAULIC COMPANY (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS VICTAULIC COMPANY OF AMERICA)

SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

TRANE U.S. INC. (FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.)

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

CAMPAGNE, INGRID A.

Attorney at WFBM, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, Ninth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

AMEELE, KEITH M.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 South Grand Ave, Ste 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

GOETZ, ANDY J.

Attorney at PRINDLE, AMARO, GOETZ, HILLYARD, BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

310 Golden Shore, Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-3759

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

1111 Broadway Street,, Ste 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at HUGO PARKER, LLP

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MAHAFFEY, MARGARET FLYNN

Attorney at WFBM, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, Ninth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

LANGBORD, PETER BENNETT

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD

300 Lakeside Drive, Ste 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

HEALEY, CAROL LEE

Attorney at BISHOP, BARRYMARKETPLACE TOWER

6001 Shellmound St., Ste. 875

Emeryville, CA 94608

SPIRA, KIRSTEN HICKS

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Ste 700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

CHADWICK, CRISTYN N

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

355 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

GILLESPIE, JEFFREY S.

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119

Oakland, CA 94604

BALDRIDGE, PETER A

Attorney at OFC ENV HEALTH HAZARD

P O Box 942732

Sacramento, CA 94234

YARON, GEORGE DIMITRI

Attorney at YARON & ASSOCIATES

1300 Clay Street, Suite 800

Oakland, CA 94612

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive,, Suite 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

KRAUSE, NANDOR BURTON

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-3759

SKEBE, HOWARD P

Attorney at MANION GAYNOR & MANNING LLP

201 Spear Street,, 18 Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.S CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAIN

CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE IN TRIAL SETTING (TRANSACTION ID # 58357295) FILED BY DEFENDANT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.

Proof of Service for Defendant Shell Oil Company

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57599722), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN SERVED JUL-16-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY

DEFENDANT BIGGE CRANE AND RIGGING CO.S JOINDER TO OTHER DEFENDANTS OPP

DEFENDANT BIGGE CRANE AND RIGGING CO.S JOINDER TO OTHER DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 58396581) FILED BY DEFENDANT BIGGE CRANE AND RIGGING CO.

Request for Dismissal as to Defendant Atlantic Richfield Company ONLY

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58519690) AS TO DEFENDANT ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (TRANSACTION ID # 58450715) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN

Defendant J. T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.s Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57716440) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:450.00)

Proof of Service for Defendant Fluor Corporation

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57572004), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN SERVED JUL-13-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDA

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT QUAD C CORPORATION, BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58185251) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN (Fee:60.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57620544) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY (Fee:1450*)

235 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 58766914) AS TO DEFENDANT ANHEUSER-BUSCH, LLC (FKA ANHEUSER-BUSCH, INC.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58757897) AS TO DEFENDANT VICTAULIC COMPANY (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS VICTAULIC COMPANY OF AMERICA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58743764) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58743764) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION EVANS JR., CHARLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58743764) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-23-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR PER THE NOTICE OF DEATH OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY PLAINTIFF ON 3/10/16. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 58737840) AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketREMOVED FROM MASTER JURY ASBESTOS CALENDAR ON MAY-23-2016. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 503 ON OCT-20-2016 AT 1:30 PM FOR ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFF PASSED AWAY PER NOTICE OF DEATH AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH FILED ON 3/10/16. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEATH AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH (TRANSACTION ID # 58697139) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
245 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57572004), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN SERVED JUL-13-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57572004), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN SERVED JUL-13-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TIMEC COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57572004), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN SERVED JUL-13-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57572004), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN SERVED JUL-13-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VICTAULIC COMPANY OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MONICA LEPE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR 1960, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 57556316) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR 1960, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 57556316) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR 1960, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 57556316) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN (Fee:60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STIPULATION BETWEEN BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP, ATKN COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA AND ATKN COMPANY (TRANSACTION ID # 57551187) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT AND PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVANS JR., CHARLES EVANS, MARIAN AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 3M COMPANY ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ANHEUSER-BUSCH, LLC (FKA ANHEUSER-BUSCH, INC.) ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA ATKN COMPANY (FKA GUY F. ATKINSON COMPANY) ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC. BIGGE CRANE AND RIGGING CO. CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION) CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. D. ZELINSKY & SONS, INC. DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC. FLUOR CORPORATION FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) GRINNELL LLC (FKA GRINNELL CORPORATION, AKA GRINNELL FIRE) HEXION INC. (FKA MOMENTIVE SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC.) HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. LAMONS GASKET COMPANY MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC. PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR 1960, INC. PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION PARSONS GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC. (FKA PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP INC.) PIERCE LATHING CO. (DBA PIERCE ENTERPRISES) PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION) RAYMOND INTERIOR SYSTEMS-NORTH REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY RILEY POWER INC. SANTA FE BRAUN, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO C.F. BRAUN, INC. SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. SHELL OIL COMPANY TEMPORARY PLANT CLEANERS, INC. THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY TIMEC COMPANY, INC. TOSCO CORPORATION TRANE U.S. INC. (FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.) TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA VEOLIA ES INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC. VICTAULIC COMPANY OF AMERICA ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-16-2016 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6441
Case Title:CHARLES EVANS JR. ET AL VS. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL
Court Date:DEC-26-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Granting Leave To File Third Amended Complaint
Rulings:Set for hearing on the Asbestos Law & Motion Calendar for Thursday, December 26, 2019, line 1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Granting Leave to File Third Amended Complaint is DENIED with prejudice. Plaintiff failed to demonstrate an excusable delay in filing the proposed amendment. (Moss Estate Co. v. Adler (1953) 41 Cal.2d 581, 586; see also CRC 3.1324(b).) Plaintiff also has not shown that Defendant will not be prejudiced as discovery is closed and trial is set for January 13, 2020.If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30 a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30 p.m. stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. =(503/CML)


Case Number:*******6441
Case Title:CHARLES EVANS JR. ET AL VS. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL
Court Date:DEC-12-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Defendant Quad C Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, December 12, 2019 in Department 503, Line 1.Defendant Quad-C Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment is off calendar. Withdrawal filed on December 3, 2019. = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******6441
Case Title:CHARLES EVANS JR. ET AL VS. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL
Court Date:NOV-29-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL
Rulings: On Asbestos Trial Motion Calendar for Thursday, November 29, 2018 in Department 503, Line 3. Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.'s Motion to Continue the Trial Date is granted. The trial is continued to April 15, 2019 at 11:15 a.m. in department 503. All discovery deadlines to track the new trial date, but only as it pertains to Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc. Discovery deadlines for all other defendants to track the initial trial date.If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******6441
Case Title:CHARLES EVANS JR. ET AL VS. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL
Court Date:NOV-02-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, November 2, 2017 in Department 503, Line 2. Defendant Atkn Company's motion for summary judgment and alternate motion for summary adjudication of plaintiffs' Negligence II (Survival) and Negligence II (Wrongful Death) causes of action are denied. On the issue of duty, defendant's motion fails for the following reasons, any of which are sufficient on their own to warrant denial: Even if defendant could successfully invoke the sophisticated user defense, that defense does not completely dispose of the issue of duty or of plaintiffs' two causes of action. The defense applies only to failure to warn claims and defendant did not demonstrate that plaintiffs' claims are based solely on a failure to warn theory. (See Johnson v. American Standard, Inc. (2008) 43 Cal.4th 56; Johnson v. Honeywell International Inc. (2009) 179 Cal.App.4th 549, 559; Webb v. Special Electric Co., Inc. (2016) 63 Cal.4th 167, 187.) Defendant did not properly plead the sophisticated user defense as it pertains to decedent Charles Evans, Jr. in its answer. Defendant failed to sustain its burden of demonstrating that the sophisticated user defense applies to bar plaintiffs' claims against it. Defendant's evidence does not demonstrate that decedent knew, or should have known, of the hazards of asbestos-containing insulation during the time he worked at the Willamette Shipyard in the late-1960s. (Johnson v. American Standard, Inc. (2008) 43 Cal.4th 56.) On the issue of causation, defendant failed to sustain its burden of demonstrating that plaintiffs do not possess and cannot reasonably obtain evidence that decedent was exposed to asbestos-containing products or materials attributable to defendant. Decedent's deposition testimony precludes defendant from successfully invoking the factually devoid prong of Aguilar v. Atlantic Richfield Co. (2001) 25 Cal.4th 826 or, alternatively, it is sufficient to create a triable issue whether the laborers at issue were employed by Willamette Shipyard, the sole issue raised by defendant's causation arguments. DiCola v. White Bros. Performance Products, Inc. (2008) 158 Cal.App.4th 666 does not bar decedent's identification of the name on the hard hats. Plaintiffs' objections nos. 1 through 5 are sustained. The Court did not consider defendant's reply papers for failure to lodge a courtesy copy. (S.F. Local Rules 2.7(B), 2.11(T).) If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******6441
Case Title:CHARLES EVANS JR. ET AL VS. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL
Court Date:DEC-08-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Granting Leave To File Second Amended Complaint
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for December 8, 2016, Thursday, in Department 503, Line 3. Plaintiffs' motion for order granting leave to file second amended complaint is granted. The Second Amended Complaint is deemed served as of the date of granting this motion on all defendants who have previously appeared. No opposition filed. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6441
Case Title:CHARLES EVANS JR. ET AL VS. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL
Court Date:OCT-26-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for October 26, 2016, Wednesday, in Department 503, Line 5. Prindle, Goetz, Barnes & Reinholtz LLP's motion to be relieved as counsel for defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. is granted. No opposition filed. Withdrawing counsel must submit to the Court a proposed order that includes the name of the withdrawing attorney of record as well as the law firm name. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6441
Case Title:CHARLES EVANS JR. ET AL VS. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL
Court Date:AUG-10-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Leave To File First Amended Complaint
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for August 10, 2016, Wednesday, in Department 503, Line 3. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file first amended complaint is granted. Plaintiff's first amended complaint is deemed served as of the date of granting this motion on all defendants who have previously appeared. No opposition filed. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/GLW)


Case Number:*******6441
Case Title:CHARLES EVANS JR. ET AL VS. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL
Court Date:MAR-30-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Or In Alternative Summary Adjudication
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, March 30, 2016 in Department 503, Line 3. Defendant Victaulic Company's motion for summary judgment or, in the alternative, summary adjudication is off calendar pursuant to the notice of the death of plaintiff Charles Evans, Jr. as well as the dismissal of defendant filed March 22, 2016. = (503/GLW)



Case Number:*******6441
Case Title:CHARLES EVANS JR. ET AL VS. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL
Court Date:JAN-26-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiffs' Motion For Preference / Preference Setting (Added To Calendar For Issuance Of Tentative Ruling Only)
Rulings:Plaintiffs' Motion for Preference / Preference Setting(Tentative Ruling continued from previous entry)If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/GLW)