This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 10:41:13 (UTC).

CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2011 CHARLES E YEAGER filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against WILD, CARTER TIPTON. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9156

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

YEAGER, VICTORIA

Penn Valley, CA 95946

YEAGER, CHARLES E. , GENERAL (RET.)

Claimants

AVIATION AUTOGRAPHS

BOWLIN & ASSOCIATES, INC.

BOWLIN, ED

BOWLIN, CONNIE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-10

MCDONALD, STEPHEN E.

ROBERTS, GEORGE A.

Nevada City, CA 95959

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

MORRISON, NORMAN

DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

MCDONALD, STEVEN E. (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD)

WILD, CARTER & TIPTON , A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

PHILLIPS, JOHN

ELIASON, ROBERT

MURRAY, CHARLES J.

BROWN, BRUCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorneys

NOONAN, TODD M.

Attorney at STEVENS & O'CONNELL LLP

400 Capitol Mall, Ste 1400

Sacramento, CA 95814

SERLIN, MARK A

Attorney at SERLIN & WHITEFORD LLP

700 E Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

COLE, JONATHAN B.

Attorney at NEMECEK & COLE, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

15260 Ventura Blvd., Ste 920

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

WHITNEY, MARSHALL C.

Attorney at MCCORMICK, BARSTOW, SHEPPARD, WAYTE & CARRUTH LLP

P.O. Box 28912, 5 River Park Place East

Fresno, CA 93720-1501

DELAPENA, GREGORY RAMON

Attorney at DE LA PENA & HOLIDAY LLP

One Embarcadero Center, Ste 2860

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST PLAINTIFFS BASED ON THE UNDERLYING HOA ACTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF VICTORIA YEAGER

MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST PLAINTIFFS BASED ON THE UNDERLYING HOA ACTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF VICTORIA YEAGER (TRANSACTION ID # 56110831) FILED BY DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP MURRAY, CHARLES J. MCDONALD, STEVEN E. (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD) HEARING SET FOR DEC-26-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:500.00)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION BASED ON THE CURRENT DEC. 9, 2013 TRIAL DATE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57700840) FILED BY DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP MURRAY, CHARLES J. MCDONALD, STEVEN E. (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

DECISION APPROVING DISCOVERY PLAN TO IDENTIFY EVIDENCE AS TO THE EOLLECTABILITY OF ANY JUDGMENT AND ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO IDENTIFY ADDITIONAL DEPOSITIONS IT DESIRES TO TAKE ON CLAIMS AGAINST THE SCOTT ROBERTSON DEFENDANTS (CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1590)

THE DLPM PARTIESa?? BRIEF RE IMPROPRIETY OF JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FACTS STATED APPELLATE OPINIONS OR JUDGMENTS

BRIEF RE IMPROPRIETY OF JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FACTS STATED APPELLATE OPINIONS OR JUDGMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 56839265) FILED BY DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP MURRAY, CHARLES J. MCDONALD, STEVEN E. (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD)

THE DLPM PARTIES? MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56894900) FILED BY DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP MURRAY, CHARLES J. MCDONALD, STEVEN E. (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD) (Fee:60.00)

ORDER

ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST PLAINTIFFS BASED ON UNDERLYING HOA ACTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF VICTORIA YEAGER

SUPPLEMENTAL CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST PLAINTIFFS BASED ON THE UNDERLYING HOA ACTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF VICTORIA YEAGER

SUPPLEMENTAL CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST PLAINTIFFS BASED ON THE UNDERLYING HOA ACTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF VICTORIA YEAGER (TRANSACTION ID # 56546798) FILED BY DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP MURRAY, CHARLES J. MCDONALD, STEVEN E. (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD)

OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST PLAINTIFFS BASED ON THE UNDERLYING HOA ACTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF VICTORIA YEAGER

OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST PLAINTIFFS BASED ON THE UNDERLYING HOA ACTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF VICTORIA YEAGER (TRANSACTION ID # 56543242) FILED BY DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

COMPLAINT

PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE, COMPLAINT TRANSFERRED FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEAGER, CHARLES E. , GENERAL (RET.) YEAGER, VICTORIA AS TO DEFENDANT WILD, CARTER & TIPTON , A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION PHILLIPS, JOHN ELIASON, ROBERT MORRISON, NORMAN DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE BROWN, BRUCE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-12-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-13-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-28-2011 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

REGISTER OF ACTIONS - TRANSFERRED FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY SUPERIOR

REGISTER OF ACTIONS - TRANSFERRED FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT - FILINGS FROM SEPTEMBER 11, 2009 THROUGH FEBRUARY 9, 2011 - SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (NOTE: ONLY THE 5TH CAUSE OF ACTION OF THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT WAS TRANSFERRED TO SF SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEAGER, CHARLES E. , GENERAL (RET.) YEAGER, VICTORIA AS TO DEFENDANT WILD, CARTER & TIPTON , A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION PHILLIPS, JOHN ELIASON, ROBERT MORRISON, NORMAN BROWN, BRUCE ROBERTS, GEORGE A. DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP MCDONALD, STEPHEN E. MURRAY, CHARLES J. DOES 1-10

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERTS, GEORGE A.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP MCDONALD, STEPHEN E. MURRAY, CHARLES J. (Fee:1230.00)

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT YEAGER, CHARLES E. , GENERAL (RET.) YEAGER, VICTORIA

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR FEB-22-2012 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUG-24-2012 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 503. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR SEP-10-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUG-12-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

228 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASE OF LIEN ON PENDING ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 15225010) FILED BY CLAIMANT AVIATION AUTOGRAPHS BOWLIN & ASSOCIATES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57700840) FILED BY DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP MURRAY, CHARLES J. MCDONALD, STEVEN E. (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMOVED FROM COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON AUG-11-2015 IN DEPT. 502 - MATTER SETTLED IN D302 ON 7/30/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR AUG-03-2015 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING SET FOR AUG-03-2015 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketSETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD AND CASE WAS SETTLED. SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WAS PLACED ON THE RECORD AS CONFIDENTIAL. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, REPORTER: ANGELA POURTABIB, TEL. NO. 1-415-601-7054

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL SET FOR JUL-30-2015 CONTINUED TO AUG-11-2015 AT 2:30 PM IN 502 AS ORDERED BY THE COURT FOR FURTHER HEARING. JUDGE: HON. A. JAMES ROBERTSON II; CLERK: MARJORIE L. MANZELLA; REPORTER: TAMARA WILLAT, C.S.R. #4609; (TELEPHONE: 415-272-1753).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION APPROVING DISCOVERY PLAN TO IDENTIFY EVIDENCE AS TO THE EOLLECTABILITY OF ANY JUDGMENT AND ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO IDENTIFY ADDITIONAL DEPOSITIONS IT DESIRES TO TAKE ON CLAIMS AGAINST THE SCOTT ROBERTSON DEFENDANTS (CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1590)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR JUL-30-2015 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
441 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2011
  • DocketORDER (AMENDED) SEVERING AND ORDERING A SEPARATE TRIAL OF THE PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS DE LA PENA & MCDONALD LLP, STEVEN E. MCDONALD AND CHARLES J. MURRAY AND TRANSFERRING VENUE OF SUCH CAUSE OF ACTION TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT (FORWARDED FROM SACRAMENTO SUPERIOR COURT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR LESSER, DON A AS ATTORNEY FOR YEAGER, CHARLES E. , GENERAL (RET.) YEAGER, VICTORIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERTS, GEORGE A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (NOTE: ONLY THE 5TH CAUSE OF ACTION OF THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT WAS TRANSFERRED TO SF SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEAGER, CHARLES E. , GENERAL (RET.) YEAGER, VICTORIA AS TO DEFENDANT WILD, CARTER & TIPTON , A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION PHILLIPS, JOHN ELIASON, ROBERT MORRISON, NORMAN BROWN, BRUCE ROBERTS, GEORGE A. DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP MCDONALD, STEPHEN E. MURRAY, CHARLES J. DOES 1-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: LESSER, DON A SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR YEAGER, VICTORIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: LESSER, DON A SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR YEAGER, CHARLES E. , GENERAL (RET.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTER OF ACTIONS - TRANSFERRED FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT - FILINGS FROM SEPTEMBER 11, 2009 THROUGH FEBRUARY 9, 2011 - SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • DocketFILING FEES OF $410 PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE, COMPLAINT TRANSFERRED FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEAGER, CHARLES E. , GENERAL (RET.) YEAGER, VICTORIA AS TO DEFENDANT WILD, CARTER & TIPTON , A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION PHILLIPS, JOHN ELIASON, ROBERT MORRISON, NORMAN DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE BROWN, BRUCE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-12-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-13-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-28-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:JAN-15-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Defendants' Motion To Trifurcate Trial
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, January 15, 2015, Line 2, DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP, CHARLES MURRAY, MCDONALD, STEVEN E. (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD) Defendants' Motion To Trifurcate Trial.The motion is denied without prejudice. Defendant may renew the motion before the trial judge. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4:00 p.m. stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if in pro per on the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/AJR)


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:JAN-07-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION Against Plaintiffs Based On The Underlying Hoa Action And Motion For Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Victoria Yeager
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, January 7, 2015, Line 4, DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP, CHARLES MURRAY, MCDONALD, STEVEN E. (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD) MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION Against Plaintiffs Based On The Underlying Hoa Action And Motion For Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Victoria Yeager.The matter is continued on the Court's motion to January 23, 2015. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =(302/EHG)


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:NOV-05-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiffs Yeagers Motion Seeking Leave To File A Second Amended Complaint
Rulings:Matter on calendar on Wednesday, November 5, 2014, Line 2, PLAINTIFFs CHARLES YEAGER and VICTORIA YEAGER's Motion Seeking Leave To File A Second Amended Complaint.Motion denied without prejudice. Plaintiff fails to explain the delay in bringing its Motion, and none of the declarations provide sufficient detail as to what new facts were discovered, when and how they were discovered, and why there were not previously known or discovered. (See CRC Rule 3.1324.) Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4:00 p.m. stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if in pro per on the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/EHG)


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:SEP-26-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiffs Yeagers Motion Seeking Leave To File A Second Amended Complaint
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, September 26, 2014, Line 4, PLAINTIFFS CHARLES YEAGER and VICTORIA YEAGER's Motion Seeking Leave To File A Second Amended Complaint.Continued to October 24, 2014 to give moving party the opportunity to comply with Local Rule 2.6B. Moving party must deliver courtesy copies of the moving and reply papers to Department 302, with a cover letter stating the new hearing date, no later than September 26, 2014 at 4:00 pm or the motion will be denied. Any exhibit must be separated by an exhibit tab per CRC 3.1110(f). The court has courtesy copies of the opposition papers. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =(302/EHG)


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:NOV-19-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:The Law Firm Of Gibson & Gibson'S Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel For The Plaintiffs Gen. Charles Yeager And Victoria Yeager
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Tuesday , November 19, 2013, Line 19, The Law Firm Of Gibson & Gibson'S Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel For The Plaintiffs Gen. Charles Yeager And Victoria YeagerHearing required. The Court is inclined to grant the motion to withdraw as counsel.=302/mjm


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:NOV-18-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings:On calendar for Monday, November 18, 2013, Line 4, DEFENDANTs DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP, STEPHEN MCDONALD and CHARLES MURRAY's MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTThe motion is granted with respect to the Bowlin and AMD matters. Defendants have submitted new evidence meeting their burden of production, and Plaintiffs have submitted no evidence raising an issue of fact as to whether there was a republication such that the statute of limitations had not run. The motion is granted as to the AT&T matter. Defendants submitted new evidence as to the lack of any impact on the judgment, and Plaintiffs made no substantive response to those arguments or evidence. The possibility of excessive fees or mishandled documents is not a basis to deny the motion in the absence of evidence that there would have been a more advantageous outcome. The motion is denied with respect to the homeowners' association action. A plaintiff's statements at deposition are an inadequate basis to prove the absence of any evidence to assert a claim. Just because Mrs. Yeager is not aware of claims or evidence, does not establish that Plaintiffs' counsel will not be able to produce evidence at trial. Defendants have not carried their burden of production. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and in compliance with Code of Civil Procedure 437c(g) and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =302/pjb


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:NOV-08-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, November 8, 2013, Line 2, PLAINTIFFs CHARLES YEAGER and VICTORIA YEAGER's MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD.The motion is continued to December 2, 2013. Plaintiff's counsel is instructed to obtain an order shortening time in Department 206 for a motion to continue the trial date. The motion to continue trial date should be heard prior to the hearing on the motion to withdraw on December 2, 2013. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. =(302/EHG)


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:NOV-01-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, November 1, 2013, Line 5, DEFENDANTs DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP, CHARLES MURRAY and STEVEN E. MCDONALD's (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.Continued on the Court's own motion to November 18, 2013. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:FEB-15-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion For A Protective Order Re: The Deposition Of Charles J Murray And For Imposition Of A Monetary Sanction In The Amount Of $1,060 Against Pltf Victoria Yeagerf
Rulings:Set for hearing on Friday, February 15, 2013, Line 7, DEFENDANTS DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP, MCDONALD, STEVEN E. (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD) Notice Of Motion For A Protective Order Re: The Deposition Of Charles J Murray And For Imposition Of A Monetary Sanction In The Amount Of $1,060 Against Plaintiff Victoria YeagerGranted, in part. In light of the court order issued on February 1, 2013, the motion for protective order is granted to the extent that the parties have not already agreed to reschedule the depositions to a time after the depositions of the Plaintiffs, which must be taken first, and to a place satisfying the statutory requirements. Sanctions are denied.The court will not provide a court reporter for this discovery hearing. If any party wishes a reporter, the parties must meet and confer and agree on a single reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. = (302/PJB)


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:FEB-01-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Mtn To Compell Pltf'S To Appear At Depo And Imposing A Monetary Sanction (Re-Notice)
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, February 1, 2013, Line 3, DEFENDANTs DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP & STEPHEN MCDONALD's motion To Compell PlaintiffS To Appear At Deposition And Imposing A Monetary Sanction (Re-Notice).Off calendar. Duplicate entry. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:JAN-29-2013 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion For A Protective Order Re: The Deposition Of Charles J Murray And For Imposition Of A Monetary Sanction In The Amount Of $1,060 Against Pltf Victoria Yeagerf
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, January 29, 2013, at 9:00 am, line 1, DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP, MCDONALD, STEVEN E. (SUED AS STEPHEN E. MCDONALD) Notice Of Motion For A Protective Order Re: The Deposition Of Charles J Murray And For Imposition Of A Monetary Sanction In The Amount Of $1,060 Against Plaintiff Victoria YeagerPro Tem Judge Robert Kane, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge.The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: The parties are to appear. With regard to the three pending motions, the parties are directed to meet and confer as to specific times, dates and places for the depositions at issue that will be reduced to an order that will not be subject to change absent good cause. If the parties cannot reach an agreement, they should be prepared to explain their position to the court. In addition, if sanctions are still being sought, the parties should be prepared to argue whether sanctions should be awarded and if so in what amount. =302/JPT


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:JAN-15-2013 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Mtn Compelling To Appear At Depo
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, January 15, 2013, Line 2, DEFENDANT DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP'S Motion Compelling To Appear At DepositionPro Tem Judge James Watson, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge.The Pro Tem has not issued a tentative ruling on this motion. Each party is required to bring a proposed order to the hearing. =302/JPT


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:JAN-09-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion Andm Otion To Vacate Trial Date And All Realted Dates And Deadlines;
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, January 9, 2013, Line 2, PLAINTIFFs CHARLES YEAGER and VICTORIA YEAGER's Motion To Vacate Trial Date And All Related Dates And Deadlines.Off calendar. The motion must be noticed in the proper department, which is Department 206. = (302/MJM)


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:DEC-28-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Mtn To Compell Pltf'S To Appear At Depo And Imposing A Monetary Sanction (Re-Notice)
Rulings:Set for hearing on Friday, December 28, 2012, Line 3. DEFENDANTS DE LA PENA & MCDONALD, LLP, STEPHEN MCDONALD'S Motion To Compell Plaintiff To Appear At Depo And Imposing A Monetary Sanction. This matter is continued to January 15, 2013, to be heard in Department 301 at 9:00 a.m. Both parties are to provide courtesy copies of their papers in compliance with San Francisco Local Rule 2.6B. The Court only has a courtesy copy of the reply papers. Please attach a cover letter to your papers reflecting the new hearing date. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******9156
Case Title:CHARLES E. YEAGER et al VS. WILD, CARTER & TIPTON et al
Court Date:MAR-07-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON WEDNESDAY, MARCH 7, 2012, LINE 6, PLAINTIFFS CHARLES YEAGER AND VICTORIA YEAGER'S COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD.Granted as to Charles Yeager and off calendar as to Victoria Yeager. No opposition filed and good cause shown as to Charles Yeager. A substitution was filed on February 14 as to Victoria Yeager. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the court will sign the proposed order submitted with the moving papers as to Charles Yeager only. = (302/HEK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELAPENA, GREGORY R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLE JONATHAN BERRES ESQ.