This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:43:30 (UTC).

CHARLENE DYSART et al VS. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2007 CHARLENE DYSART filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4252

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DYSART, JOHNNY "JOHN" EARL

Defendants

BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

PACCAR INC.

CRANE CO.

MCWANE, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SBM TO CLOW CORP AND YEOMAN BROS., CO.

DOVER RESOURCES, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A "BLACKMER" BRANDED PRODUCTS

MCWANE INC.

THE PEP BOYS, MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

CSK AUTO, INC.

CARLISLE CORPORATION (F/K/A CARLISLE TIRE & RUBBER CO.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SII TO THE BENDIX CORP.

PACCAR, INC., INDIVIDUALLY, D/B/A PETERBILT MOTORS COMPANY, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PACIFIC CAR & FOUNDRY COMPANY

METALCLAD INSULATION CORP.

SOCO WEST, INC. FKA BRENNTAG WEST, INC.

BAYER CORPSCIENCE, INC.

FRUEHAUF CORPORATION

RPM, INC.

ALFA LAVAL INC

H. B. FULLER COMPANY

76 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Ave, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

555 12Th Street, Suite 1280

Oakland, CA 94607

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center,, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

LOPEZ, RONALD FRANK

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY

One Embarcadero Ctr., 18 Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3600

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at ESKANOS & ADLER

2325 Clayton Road

Concord, CA 94520

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

INTRIERI, MARK G

Attorney at CHAPMAN & INTRIERI, L.L.P.

2236 Mariner Square Drive, Third Floor, Suite 300

Alameda, CA 94501-1090

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAYERS, WILLIAM J.

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

444 South Flower Street 8Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2901

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

24 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Notice of Posting Jury Fees (Baron&Budd)

JURY FEES, TRAN # R0207626J003, TAG # 018594 (TRANSACTION ID # 15360632) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF DYSART, CHARLENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO EARL L. DYSART, DECEASED DYSART, RANDY DYSART, JOHNNY "JOHN" EARL DYSART, GARY ALAN DYSART, ROBIN MARK LUTHER, RANDALL (Fee:150.00)

DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.???S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CHARLENE DYSART???S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (WRONGFUL DEATH)

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16234173) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. (Fee:335.00)

NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATIONS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST BARON & BUDD IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,545

NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATIONS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST BARON BUDD IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,545, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 22673784) FILED BY DEFENDANT NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION HEARING SET FOR DEC-23-2008 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610 (Fee:40.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXIS NEXIS AND PERSONAL SERVICE RE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANYS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXIS NEXIS AND PERSONAL SERVICE RE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANYS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 23242278) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

Substitution of Attorney - Civil (Without Court Order)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 23479283): LOPEZ RONALD F SUBSTITUTED FOR WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL AS ATTORNEY FOR GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DETROIT DIESEL ENGINE DIVISION AND DETROIT DIESEL ALLISON DIVISION AND DETROIT DIESEL CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO 'DETROIT DIESEL ENGINE DIVISION' AND DETROIT DIESEL ALLISON DIVISION OF GENERAL MOTORS

Request for Dismissal of Leslie Controls Inc. Only With Mutual Waiver of Costs

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23654673) AS TO DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC

EXHIBITS C THROUGH E TO DECLARATION OF ANGEL L. LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF PACCAR INC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBITS C THROUGH E TO DECLARATION OF ANGEL L. LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF PACCAR INCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 23988707) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACCAR INC.

Request for Dismissal of Defendant: FRUEHAUF CORPORATION, with mutual waiver of costs

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 29190702) AS TO DEFENDANT FRUEHAUF CORPORATION

ANSWER OF FOSTER WHEELER LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVAL - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16056913) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Fee:335.00)

Mack Truck Incs Answer to Complaint and POS.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16145983) FILED BY DEFENDANT MACK TRUCKS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16273270) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16335443) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO FILE AND SERVE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANYS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST BARON & BUDD IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,545

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' FAILURE TO FILE AND SERVE OPPOSITION TO DEFT GENUINE PARTS CO.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST BARON & BUDD IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,545 (TRANSACTION ID # 22975448)

EXHIBIT F TO DECLARATION OF MARC BRAINICH IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBIT F TO DECLARATION OF MARC BRAINICH IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 23242278) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 23904806) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DYSART, CHARLENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO EARL L. DYSART, DECEASED DYSART, JOHNNY "JOHN" EARL DYSART, GARY ALAN DYSART, ROBIN MARK DYSART, RANDALL LUTHER

DECLARATION OF ROBERT C. CRANE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

DECLARATION OF ROBERT C. CRANE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 24072553) FILED BY DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC SII TO ABEX CORPORATION ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS PNEUMO ABEX, LLC

Request for Dismissals of Defendant A. W. CHESTERTON COMPANY; with mutual waiver of costs

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 29190702) AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

476 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2010
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-26-2010. OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 32559731)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-29-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-26-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-29-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-29-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL CALENDAR AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON APR-29-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. SETTLEMENT REPORTED TO DEPT. 603. TRIAL DATE TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 29346574) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 29335579) FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29274334) AS TO DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 29190702) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DYSART, CHARLENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO EARL L. DYSART, DECEASED DYSART, JOHNNY "JOHN" EARL DYSART, GARY ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 29190702) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
541 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEF. CUUMINS ENGINE COMPANY, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS CUMMINS, INC., (FKA CUMMINS ENGINEER COMPANY, INC.)S OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 15977407) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15977407) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15977407) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED (AMENDED) TO PLAINTIFF DYSART, CHARLENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO EARL L. DYSART, DECEASED DYSART, JOHNNY "JOHN" EARL DYSART, GARY ALAN DYSART, ROBIN MARK DYSART, RANDALL LUTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXISNEXIS FILE AND SERVE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15579157) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DYSART, CHARLENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO EARL L. DYSART, DECEASED DYSART, JOHNNY "JOHN" EARL DYSART, GARY ALAN DYSART, ROBIN MARK DYSART, RANDALL LUTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15579157) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DYSART, CHARLENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO EARL L. DYSART, DECEASED DYSART, JOHNNY "JOHN" EARL DYSART, GARY ALAN DYSART, ROBIN MARK DYSART, RANDALL LUTHER AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ALFA LAVAL INC AMCORD INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO RIVERSIDE CEMENT DOES 1-300 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • JURY FEES, TRAN # R0207626J003, TAG # 018594 (TRANSACTION ID # 15360632) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF DYSART, CHARLENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO EARL L. DYSART, DECEASED DYSART, RANDY DYSART, JOHNNY "JOHN" EARL DYSART, GARY ALAN DYSART, ROBIN MARK LUTHER, RANDALL (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF DYSART, CHARLENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO EARL L. DYSART, DECEASED DYSART, RANDY DYSART, JOHNNY "JOHN" EARL DYSART, GARY ALAN DYSART, ROBIN MARK LUTHER, RANDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DYSART, CHARLENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO EARL L. DYSART, DECEASED DYSART, RANDY DYSART, JOHNNY "JOHN" EARL DYSART, GARY ALAN DYSART, ROBIN MARK LUTHER, RANDALL AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ALFA LAVAL INC AMCORD INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO RIVERSIDE CEMENT DOES 1-300 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-18-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RPM, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MCWANE,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CARLISLE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant