This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:38:27 (UTC).

CHANTAL MARTIN DEL CAMPO VS. GENERAL MOTORS, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by CHANTAL MARTIN DEL CAMPO against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4378

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

DOES 1 TO 10, LLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

Notice of Motion for Protective Order

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100053055) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS, LLC HEARING SET FOR DEC-06-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302

Notice of Appearance of Counsel

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 100070383) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN

PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLAR

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF JOHNNY OGATA; [PROPOSED] ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100056287) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62206127) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

General Motors LLCs Limited Opposition to Plaintiffs Ex Parte

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE (TRANSACTION ID # 100038811) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Plaintiffs Notice of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (TRANSACTION ID # 62322636) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN HEARING SET FOR OCT-30-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAI

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100032901) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion t

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (TRANSACTION ID # 100051608) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN

GMs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs M

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL (TRANSACTION ID # 100038635) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033058), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN SERVED MAR-01-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

General Motors LLCs Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 100052636) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Declaration of Rodney Gin in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Fu

DECLARATION OF RODNEY GIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (TRANSACTION ID # 62322636) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO BE HEARD BY A JUDGE PRO TEM.

Plaintiffs reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Comp

REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (TRANSACTION ID # 100051765) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN

Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-21-2019 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT. 210 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER PETER H. KANG

GMs Separate Statement

SEPARATE STATEMENT ISO OPPOS TO PLTF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS (TRANSACTION ID # 100038635) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5218C12M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5218B06M005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5218A25M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4918810M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8018711J004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R7818406F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0918215F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-03-2019 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON OCT-29-2019 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-21-2019 - NOT HELD AND REMOVED (0.5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100071907) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF RODNEY GIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (TRANSACTION ID # 62322636) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (TRANSACTION ID # 62322636) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (TRANSACTION ID # 62322636) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN HEARING SET FOR OCT-30-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 62206127) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62206127) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR JAN-22-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-18-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100032901) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS, LLC (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033058), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN SERVED MAR-01-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEL CAMPO, CHANTAL MARTIN AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS, LLC DOES 1 TO 10, LLC SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.