Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:49:35 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS. DANNY P CHOW et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DANNY P CHOW. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8471

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendants

CHOW, DANNY P

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N.

OSTERMAN, PETER R

Attorney at KRISTA L. WHITE & ASSOCIATES, P.S.

700 Ygnacio Valley Road,, Suite 360

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-13-2013 CONTINUED TO JAN-15-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $529.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $529.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 CONTINUED TO NOV-13-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-15-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P $18,600.30 PRINCIPAL, $529.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $19,129.80, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $529.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 1033(B)(2) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC SERVED FEB-27-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

COMPLAINT

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: OSTERMAN, PETER R SUBSTITUTED FOR ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N. AS ATTORNEY FOR CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: OSTERMAN, PETER R SUBSTITUTED FOR ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N. AS ATTORNEY FOR CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-15-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P $18,600.30 PRINCIPAL, $529.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $19,129.80, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF INTEREST FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $529.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-13-2013 CONTINUED TO JAN-15-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $529.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 CONTINUED TO NOV-13-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $529.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC SERVED FEB-27-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, DANNY P DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less