Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:49:29 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS. ALEXANDER A FEKULA et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEXANDER A FEKULA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8470

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendants

FEKULA, ALEXANDER A

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N.

Attorney at BISHOP, WHITE, MARSHALL & WEIBEL, P.S

901 Sunvalley Blvd., Suite 220

Concord, CA 94520

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT FEKULA, ALEXANDER A DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - DISMISSAL ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT FEKULA, ALEXANDER A DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less