This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 02:29:42 (UTC).

CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL VS. PEGGY LYNN GREEN

Case Summary

On 01/20/2012 CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST DBA ST MARY'S MEDICAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PEGGY LYNN GREEN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7522

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

GREEN, PEGGY LYNN

Berkeley, CA 94702

CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER

GREEN, PEGGY L.

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

Plaintiff and Appellant

CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER

Other

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA

205 Lennon Lane Ste.201

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

BECKELMAN, ELLIOT STEVEN

Attorney at STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS DIVISION OF STANDARS ENFORCEMENT

455 Golden Gate Ave, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

HIPSHMAN, ANNE

FORSEY, MORGAN P.

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 17Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney at STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONSCOLLECTION UNIT

455 Golden Gate Ave.,10Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT RESPONDENT GREEN, PEGGY LYNN GREEN, PEGGY L. RECOVER FROM APPELLANT CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER $11,228.98 PRINCIPAL, $3,649.41 INTEREST, TOTAL JUDGMENT $14,878.39, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS - COST PER COST BILL AND ATTY FEES THRU NOTICED MOTION. NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (WITH FEE)

FEE PAID ON APPLICATION TO RELEASE UNDERTAKING TO PARTIALLY SATISFY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREEN, PEGGY LYNN (Fee:EXEMPT)

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF ELLIOT S. ECKELMAN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO PARTIALLY RELEASE UNDERTAKING TO SATISFY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREEN, PEGGY LYNN

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREEN, PEGGY LYNN AS TO APPELLANT CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER

LABOR COMMISSION APPEAL

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF THE ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER (EMPLOYER) FILED BY APPELLANT CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER AS TO RESPONDENT GREEN, PEGGY LYNN JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:410.00)

NOTICE

NOTICE OF REPRESENTATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREEN, PEGGY LYNN

Notice of Time and Place of Trial (Labor Appeal)

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE MAILED (LABOR APPEAL) COURT TRIAL SET FOR MAY-07-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

MINUTES FOR MAY-07-2012 11:00 AM

MINUTES FOR MAY-07-2012 11:00 AM

TRIAL BRIEF

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY PLAINTIFF/RESPNDENT

TRIAL BRIEF

TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANT/APPELLANT

MOTIONS IN LIMINE

MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREEN, PEGGY LYNN

EXHIBIT LIST

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY PLAINTIFF/RESPONDENT

MINUTES FOR MAY-08-2012 9:30 AM

MINUTES FOR MAY-08-2012 9:30 AM

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $904.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE JUL-27-2012, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREEN, PEGGY LYNN

ORDER

ORDER EXONERATING BOND

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED EXONERATING BOND FILED BY PLAINTIFF CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER

RECEIPT OF PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS

RECEIPT OF PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT OF PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED EXONERATING BOND FILED BY PLAINTIFF CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER EXONERATING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION, [PROPOSED] ORDER, DEC OF MORGAN P. FORSEY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXONERATE BOND, AND POS FILED BY APPELLANT CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER SERVED SEP-09-2013, MAIL ON RESPONDENT GREEN, PEGGY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY APPELLANT CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY APPELLANT CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO EXONERATE BOND, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY APPELLANT CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO EXONERATE BOND FILED BY APPELLANT CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREEN, PEGGY LYNN AS TO APPELLANT CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ELLIOT S. BECKELMAN IN SUPPORT OF THE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO PARTIALLY RELEASE SURETY BOND PROCEEDS FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREEN, PEGGY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREEN, PEGGY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANT/APPELLANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY PLAINTIFF/RESPNDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR MAY-07-2012 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • MASTER COURT CALENDAR OF MAY-07-2012 ASSIGNED TO COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2012 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT. 624, VISITING JUDGE LYNN O'MALLEY-TAYLOR. TIME ESTIMATE: 1/2 DAY. JUDGE: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: BECKELMAN, ELLIOT STEVEN SUBSTITUTED FOR HIPSHMAN, ANNE AS ATTORNEY FOR GREEN, PEGGY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE MAILED (LABOR APPEAL) COURT TRIAL SET FOR MAY-07-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REPRESENTATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREEN, PEGGY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • BOND #105679564 IN THE AMOUNT OF $25,740.26 FILED BY APPELLANT CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL OF THE ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER (EMPLOYER) FILED BY APPELLANT CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER AS TO RESPONDENT GREEN, PEGGY LYNN JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less